Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Mary F Walrath
Case #: 1:21-bk-10146
Case Filed:Jan 31, 2021

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors200-999
Est. Assets$1,000,000,001 to $10 billion
Est. Liabilities $1,000,000,001 to $10 billion
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Knotel, Inc.
5 Union Sq W # 9
New York, NY 10003-3306
Represented By
Robert J. Dehney
Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801


1. Knotel Files For Chapter 11 Bankruptcy (allwork.space)
Submitted Mon 02/08/2021
Docket last updated: 4 minutes ago
Friday, March 05, 2021
361 361 2 pgs order Order Fri 03/05 2:17 PM
Order Approving Stipulation By and Between the Debtors, Western Alliance Bank, Including Its Bridge Bank Division, and Digiatech, LLC in Connection with Relief from the Automatic Stay Related [+] Signed on 3/5/2021. (LMC)
Related: [-] 345
Att: 1 13 pgs Exhibit 1
360 360 claims Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing Fri 03/05 1:51 PM
Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing re: Third Omnibus Order (I) Authorizing the Debtors to Reject Certain Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases Nunc Pro Tunc to the Petition Date, (II) Abandon any Personal Property that Remains at the Lease Premises, and (III) Granting Related Relief [Docket No. 332] . Filed by Omni Agent Solutions, Inc.. Related [+] (Lowry, Randy)
Related: [-] 332
359 359 claims Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing Fri 03/05 1:49 PM
Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing re: First Omnibus Order (I) Authorizing the Debtors to Reject Certain Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases Nunc Pro Tunc to the Petition Date, (II) Abandon any Personal Property that Remains at the Lease Premises, and (III) Granting Related Relief [Docket No. 331] . Filed by Omni Agent Solutions, Inc.. Related [+] (Lowry, Randy)
Related: [-] 331
358 358 claims Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing Fri 03/05 1:47 PM
Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing re: Final Order (I) Authorizing the Debtors to (A) Obtain Post-Petition Financing, (B) Grant Senior Secured Liens and Superpriority Administrative Expense Claims, and (C) Utilize Cash Collateral; (II) Granting Adequate Protection to the Prepetition Secured Lender; (III) Modifying the Automatic Stay; and (IV) Granting Related Relief [Docket No. 330] . Filed by Omni Agent Solutions, Inc.. Related [+] (Lowry, Randy)
Related: [-] 330
357 357 claims Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing Fri 03/05 1:44 PM
Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing re: Order Granting Leave to File a Reply [Docket No. 329] . Filed by Omni Agent Solutions, Inc.. Related [+] (Lowry, Randy)
Related: [-] 329
356 356 misc Certification of Counsel(Aty) Fri 03/05 12:34 PM
Certification of Counsel Requesting Entry of Order Approving Stipulation and Protective Order Regarding Confidentiality of Discovery Material and Inadvertent Disclosure of Privileged Material Filed by Digiatech, LLC. (Meloro, Dennis)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
355 355 order Appear pro hac vice Fri 03/05 11:45 AM
Order Approving Motion for Admission pro hac vice of Andrew M. Parlen Related [+] Signed on 3/5/2021. (LMC)
Related: [-] 353
354 354 order Appear pro hac vice Fri 03/05 11:45 AM
Order Approving Motion for Admission pro hac vice of Julia Tarver Mason Wood Related [+] Signed on 3/5/2021. (LMC)
Related: [-] 352
353 353 motion Pro Hac Vice Admission - Motion Fri 03/05 10:40 AM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice of Andrew M. Parlen of Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP . Receipt Number 3564192, Filed by Moelis & Company LLC. (Morgan, Pauline)
Related: [-]
352 352 motion Pro Hac Vice Admission - Motion Fri 03/05 10:38 AM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice of Julia Tarver Mason Wood of Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP . Receipt Number 3515056, Filed by Moelis & Company LLC. (Morgan, Pauline)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 04, 2021
351 351 claims Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing Thu 03/04 4:47 PM
Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing re: Debtors' Fourth Omnibus Motion for Entry of an Order (I) Authorizing the Debtors to Reject Certain Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases Nunc Pro Tunc to The Rejection Date, (II) Abandon any Personal Property that Remains at the Lease Premises, and (III) Granting Related Relief [Docket No. 318] . Filed by Omni Agent Solutions, Inc.. Related [+] (Lowry, Randy)
Related: [-] 318
350 350 claims Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing Thu 03/04 4:43 PM
Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing re: Order Granting Leave to File a Reply [Docket No. 297], Order Granting Motion for Leave to File Statement and Joinder of Digiatech, LLC to Debtors Reply in Further Support of Debtors Request for Approval of Post-Petition Financing and Related Relief [Docket No. 298], Order Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 327(e) and 328(a) of the Bankruptcy Code, Bankruptcy Rule 2014(a), and Local Rule 2014-1 Authorizing Retention and Employment of Fenwick & West, LLP as Corporate Counsel for the Debtors Nunc Pro Tunc to the Petition Date [Docket No. 299], and Notice of Amended Agenda of Matters Scheduled for a Videoconference Hearing on February 26, 2021, at 10:30 A.M. (E.T.) [Docket No. 303] . Filed by Omni Agent Solutions, Inc.. Related [+] (Lowry, Randy)
Related: [-] 297 ,298 ,299 ,303
349 349 claims Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing Thu 03/04 4:41 PM
Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing re: Motion for Leave to File Debtors Reply in Support of Omnibus Rejection Motions [Docket No. 285] . Filed by Omni Agent Solutions, Inc.. Related [+] (Lowry, Randy)
Related: [-] 285
348 348 notice Withdrawal - Notice Thu 03/04 3:19 PM
Notice of Withdrawal of //Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance as Counsel and Request for Removal from Electronic and Paper Noticing Matrix Filed by Source Media, Inc.. (Riley, Richard)
Related: [-]
347 347 answer Objection Thu 03/04 3:07 PM
Objection of the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors to the Debtors' Application for Entry of an Order (I) Authorizing the Retention and Employment of Hilco Real Estate, LLC as Real Estate Consultants and Advisors for the Debtors Nunc Pro Tunc to February 5, 2021, and (II) Waiving Certain Requirements Imposed by Local Rule 2016-2 Related [+] Filed by OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF UNSECURED CREDITORS (Slaugh, David)
Related: [-] 194
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
346 346 4 pgs order Order Thu 03/04 10:29 AM
Order (SECOND OMNIBUS) (I) Authorizing the Debtors to Reject Certain Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases Nunc Pro Tunc to the Petition Date, (II) Abandon Any Personal Property That Remains at the Lease Premises, and (III) Granting Related Relief Related [+] Signed on 3/4/2021. (LMC)
Related: [-] 13 ,342
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Wednesday, March 03, 2021
345 345 misc Certification of Counsel(Aty) Wed 03/03 6:54 PM
Certification of Counsel Regarding Order Approving Stipulation by and Between the Debtors, Western Alliance Bank, Including Its Bridge Bank Division, and Digiatech, LLC in Connection with Relief from the Automatic Stay Filed by Knotel, Inc.. (Moats, Eric)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
344 344 misc Declaration Wed 03/03 4:33 PM
Declaration of John M. Jureller Regarding Refundable Services Retainer of Engine International, Inc. F/K/A ORC International, Inc. Related [+] Filed by Knotel, Inc.. (Mann, Tamara)
Related: [-] 12 ,219
Att: 1 Exhibit A
343 343 notice Appearance - Notice Wed 03/03 2:32 PM
Notice of Appearance. Filed by BSD 530 Broadway Propco LLC. (Astin, Daniel)
Related: [-]
342 342 misc Certification of Counsel(Aty) Wed 03/03 2:08 PM
Certification of Counsel Regarding Debtors Second Omnibus Motion for Entry of an Order (I) Authorizing the Debtors to Reject Certain Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases Nunc Pro Tunc to the Petition Date, (II) Abandon any Personal Property that Remains at the Lease Premises, and (III) Granting Related Relief Related [+] Filed by Knotel, Inc.. (Moats, Eric)
Related: [-] 13 ,202 ,203 ,221 ,222 ,223 ,225 ,230 ,241 ,242
Att: 1 Exhibit A- Revised Proposed Order
Att: 2 Exhibit B- Redline
341 341 notice Withdrawal - Notice Wed 03/03 2:05 PM
Notice of Withdrawal of Related [+] Filed by Knotel, Inc.. (Moats, Eric)
Related: [-] 326
340 340 order Appear pro hac vice Wed 03/03 2:01 PM
Order Approving Motion for Admission pro hac vice of Steven S. Newburgh Related [+] Signed on 3/3/2021. (LMC)
Related: [-] 334
misc Add Attorney Wed 03/03 2:39 PM
Attorney Steven J. Cohen and Daniel K. Astin for BSD 530 Broadway Propco LLC added to case Filed by BSD 530 Broadway Propco LLC. (Astin, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 02, 2021
339 339 notice Deposition - Notice Tue 03/02 9:19 PM
Notice of Deposition to Howard Lutnick Filed by OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF UNSECURED CREDITORS. (Farris, III, Joseph D.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
338 338 notice Deposition - Notice Tue 03/02 9:16 PM
Notice of Deposition Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(b)(6) and Fed. R. Bankr. P. 7030 and 9014 to Newmark Group Inc. Filed by OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF UNSECURED CREDITORS. (Farris, III, Joseph D.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
337 337 notice Deposition - Notice Tue 03/02 9:13 PM
Notice of Deposition Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(b)(6) and Fed. R. Bankr. P. 7030 and 9014 to Digiatech, LLC Filed by OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF UNSECURED CREDITORS. (Farris, III, Joseph D.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
336 336 notice Deposition - Notice Tue 03/02 9:08 PM
Notice of Deposition Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(b)(6) and Fed. R. Bankr. P. 7030 and 9014 to the Debtors Filed by OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF UNSECURED CREDITORS. (Farris, III, Joseph D.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
335 335 misc Periodic Report Tue 03/02 8:43 PM
Periodic Report Regarding Value, Operations and Profitability of Entities in Which the Debtors' Estates Hold a Substantial or Controlling Interest Periodic Report of Debtors Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule 2015.3 Filed by Knotel, Inc.. (Talmo, Matthew)
Related: [-]
334 334 motion Pro Hac Vice Admission - Motion Tue 03/02 6:17 PM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice of Steven S. Newburgh, Esquire . Receipt Number 3464618, Filed by General Hardware Manufacturing Co., Inc.. (Yurkewicz, Michael)
Related: [-]
333 333 claims Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing Tue 03/02 5:37 PM
Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing re: Debtors Motion for Entry of an Order Extending the Time to File Schedules of Assets and Liabilities and Statements of Financial Affairs [Docket No. 314] . Filed by Omni Agent Solutions, Inc.. Related [+] (Lowry, Randy)
Related: [-] 314
332 332 order Chapter 11 First Day Motions Tue 03/02 11:43 AM
Order (THIRD OMNIBUS) (I) Authorizing the Debtors to Reject Certain Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases Nunc Pro Tunc to the Petition Date, (II) Abandon Any Personal Property That Remains at the Lease Premises, and (III) Granting Related Relief Related [+] Signed on 3/2/2021. (LMC)
Related: [-] 14 ,327
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
331 331 order Chapter 11 First Day Motions Tue 03/02 11:39 AM
Order (FIRST OMNIBUS) (I) Authorizing the Debtors to Reject Certain Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases Nunc Pro Tunc to the Petition Date, (II) Abandon Any Personal Property That Remains at the Lease Premises, and (III) Granting Related Relief Related [+] Signed on 3/2/2021. (LMC)
Related: [-] 12 ,325
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
330 330 46 pgs order Order Tue 03/02 11:36 AM
Order (FINAL) (I) Authorizing the Debtors to (A) Obtain Post-Petition Financing, (B) Grant Senior Secured Liens and Superpriority Administrative Expense Claims, and (C) Utilize Cash Collateral; (II) Granting Adequate Protection to the Prepetition Secured Lender; (III) Modifying the Automatic Stay; and (IV) Granting Related Relief Related [+] Signed on 3/2/2021. (LMC)
Related: [-] 15 ,72 ,226 ,227 ,324
329 329 order Leave to File Reply Tue 03/02 10:21 AM
Order Granting Leave to File a Reply Related [+] Signed on 3/2/2021. (LMC)
Related: [-] 308
Monday, March 01, 2021
328 328 claims Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing Mon 03/01 5:07 PM
Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing re: Motion for Leave to File Debtors Reply in Support of Ordinary Course Professional Procedures [Docket No. 308] . Filed by Omni Agent Solutions, Inc.. Related [+] (Lowry, Randy)
Related: [-] 308
327 327 misc Certification of Counsel(Aty) Mon 03/01 4:48 PM
Certification of Counsel Debtors Third Omnibus Motion for Entry of an Order (I) Authorizing the Debtors to Reject Certain Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases Nunc Pro Tunc to the Petition Date, (II) Abandon any Personal Property that Remains at the Lease Premises, and (III) Granting Related Relief Related [+] Filed by Knotel, Inc.. (Talmo, Matthew)
Related: [-] 14 ,198
Att: 1 Exhibit A-Revised Proposed Order
Att: 2 Exhibit B-Redline
326 326 misc Certification of Counsel(Aty) Mon 03/01 4:38 PM
Certification of Counsel Regarding Debtors Second Omnibus Motion for Entry of an Order (I) Authorizing the Debtors to Reject Certain Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases Nunc Pro Tunc to the Petition Date, (II) Abandon any Personal Property that Remains at the Lease Premises, and (III) Granting Related Relief Related [+] Filed by Knotel, Inc.. (Talmo, Matthew)
Related: [-] 13 ,202 ,203 ,221 ,222 ,223 ,225 ,230 ,241 ,242
Att: 1 Exhibit A-Revised Proposed Order
Att: 2 Exhibit B- Redline
325 325 misc Certification of Counsel(Aty) Mon 03/01 4:23 PM
Certification of Counsel Regarding the Debtors First Omnibus Motion for Entry of an Order (I) Authorizing the Debtors to Reject Certain Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases Nunc Pro Tunc to the Petition Date, (II) Abandon any Personal Property that Remains at the Lease Premises, and (III) Granting Related Relief Related [+] Filed by Knotel, Inc.. (Talmo, Matthew)
Related: [-] 12 ,196 ,198 ,200 ,202 ,203 ,219 ,221 ,222 ,223 ,225
Att: 1 Exhibit A-Revised Order
Att: 2 Exhibit B-Redline
324 324 5 pgs misc Certification of Counsel(Aty) Mon 03/01 4:18 PM
Certification of Counsel // Certification of Committee Counsel Regarding Debtor's Motion for Entry of a Final Order (I) Authorizing the Debtors to (A) Obtain Post-Petition Financing, (B) Grant Senior Secured Liens and Superpriority Administrative Expense Claims, and (C) Utilize Cash Collateral; (II) Granting Adequate Protection to the Prepetition Secured Lender; (III) Modifying the Automatic Stay; and (IV) Granting Related Relief Related [+] Filed by OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF UNSECURED CREDITORS. (Samis, Christopher)
Related: [-] 15 ,72 ,226 ,227
Att: 1 47 pgs Exhibit A
Att: 2 50 pgs Exhibit B
323 323 3 pgs misc Certification of Counsel(Aty) Mon 03/01 3:27 PM
Certification of Counsel Regarding Debtors Motion for Interim and Final Orders Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 105, 361, 362, 363, 364, 503, 506, and 507, (I) Authorizing the Debtors to (A) Obtain Post-Petition Financing, (B) Grant Senior Secured Liens and Superpriority Administrative Expense Claims, and (C) Utilize Cash Collateral; (II) Granting Adequate Protection to the Prepetition Secured Lender; (III) Modifying the Automatic Stay; (IV) Scheduling Final Hearing; and (V) Granting Related Relief Related [+] Filed by Knotel, Inc.. (Moats, Eric)
Related: [-] 15 ,72 ,226
Att: 1 46 pgs Exhibit A- Proposed Final Order
Att: 2 52 pgs Exhibit B- Redline
322 322 claims Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing Mon 03/01 2:45 PM
Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing re: Order Authorizing the Retention and Employment of Omni Agent Solutions as Administrative Agent for the Debtors and Debtors in Possession Nunc Pro Tunc to the Petition Date [Docket No. 266], Final Order (I) Authorizing the Debtors to Pay Certain Prepetition Taxes and Fees, (II) Authorizing Banks and Financial Institutions to Honor and Process Checks and Transfers Related thereto, and (III) Granting Related Relief [Docket No. 267], Order (I) Approving Procedures for (A) Interim Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses of Retained Professionals and (B) Expense Reimbursement for Official Committee Members and (II) Granting Related Relief [Docket No. 278], Final Order (I) Authorizing Payment of Prepetition Claims of Certain Critical Vendors and (II) Granting Related Relief [Docket No. 279], Final Order (I) Prohibiting Utility Providers from Altering, Refusing or Discontinuing Utility Services, (II) Approving Proposed Adequate Assurance of Payment to Utility Providers and Authorizing Debtors to Provide Additional Assurance, (III) Establishing Procedures to Resolve Requests for Additional Assurance and (IV) Granting Related Relief [Docket No. 280], Final Order (I) Authorizing Continued use of Cash Management System, (II) Authorizing Use of Prepetition Bank Accounts, Account Control Agreements, and Payment Methods, (III) Authorizing Use of Existing Business Forms, (IV) Authorizing Continuation of Ordinary Course Intercompany Transactions, (V) Granting Administrative Priority to Postpetition Intercompany Claims, and (VI) Extending Time to Comply with the Requirements of 11 U.S.C. 345(b) [Docket No. 281], Final Order (I) Authorizing the Debtors to Pay Certain Prepetition Wages, Benefits and Other Compensation Obligations, (II) Authorizing Financial Institutions to Honor all Obligations Related Thereto, and (III) Granting Related Relief [Docket No. 282], Final Order Authorizing Debtors to (A) Continue Insurance Policies and Agreements Relating Thereto, (B) Honor Certain Prepetition Obligations in Respect Thereof, (C) Renew, Revise, Extend, Supplement, Change or Enter into New Insurance Coverage as Needed in their Business Judgment and (D) Continue to Honor Insurance Premium Finance Obligations [Docket No. 283], and Order Granting Leave to File a Reply [Docket No. 288] . Filed by Omni Agent Solutions, Inc.. Related [+] (Lowry, Randy)
Related: [-] 266 ,267 ,278 ,279 ,280 ,281 ,282 ,283 ,288
321 321 claims Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing Mon 03/01 2:40 PM
Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing re: Motion for Leave to File Debtors Reply in Further Support of Debtors Request for Approval of Post-Petition Financing and Related Relief [Docket No. 269] . Filed by Omni Agent Solutions, Inc.. Related [+] (Lowry, Randy)
Related: [-] 269
320 320 claims Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing Mon 03/01 2:38 PM
Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing re: Notice of Sale, Bidding Procedures, Auction, and Sale Hearing [Docket No. 237] and Bidding Procedures in Connection with the Sale of the Assets of the Debtors . Filed by Omni Agent Solutions, Inc.. Related [+] (Lowry, Randy)
Related: [-] 237
319 319 misc Transcript Mon 03/01 9:19 AM
Transcript regarding Hearing Held 02/26/21 RE: Second Day Motions. Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 6/1/2021. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerk's Office. For information about how to obtain a transcript, call the Clerk's Office or Contact the Court Reporter/Transcriber, Reliable, at Telephone number 302-654-8080. Filed by . Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 3/8/2021. Redaction Request Due By 3/22/2021. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 4/1/2021. Transcript access will be restricted through 6/1/2021. (LCN)
Related: [-]
Saturday, February 27, 2021
318 318 12 pgs motion Reject Lease or Executory Contract - Motion Sat 02/27 2:41 PM
Motion to Reject Lease or Executory Contract Debtors' Fourth Omnibus Motion For Entry Of An Order (I) Authorizing The Debtors To Reject Certain Executory Contracts And Unexpired Leases Nunc Pro Tunc To The Rejection Date, (II) Abandon Any Personal Property That Remains At The Lease Premises, And (III) Granting Related Relief Filed by Knotel, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 3/18/2021 at 02:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 3/11/2021. (Moats, Eric)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice
Att: 2 8 pgs Exhibit A (Proposed Order)
317 317 notice Withdrawal - Notice Sat 02/27 2:38 PM
Notice of Withdrawal of Debtors' Fourth Omnibus Motion For Entry Of An Order (I) Authorizing The Debtors To Reject Certain Executory Contracts And Unexpired Leases Nunc Pro Tunc To The Rejection Date, (II) Abandon Any Personal Property That Remains At The Lease Premises, And (III) Granting Related Relief Related [+] Filed by Knotel, Inc.. (Moats, Eric)
Related: [-] 316
316 316 motion Reject Lease or Executory Contract - Motion Sat 02/27 2:04 PM
Motion to Reject Lease or Executory Contract Debtors' Fourth Omnibus Motion For Entry Of An Order (I) Authorizing The Debtors To Reject Certain Executory Contracts And Unexpired Leases Nunc Pro Tunc To The Rejection Date, (II) Abandon Any Personal Property That Remains At The Lease Premises, And (III) Granting Related Relief Filed by Knotel, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 3/18/2021 at 02:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 3/11/2021. (Moats, Eric)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice
Att: 2 Exhibit A (Proposed Order)
Friday, February 26, 2021
315 315 court Minute Entry Fri 02/26 5:12 PM
MINUTE ENTRY Re: Related [+] APPEARANCES: See attached sign-in sheet MATTERS: 1 through 9) Orders entered under Certifications 10 through 12) Order due under COC 13) Order due under COC 14 and 15) Orders entered under Certifications 16) Continued 17) Heard and continued 18) Continued 19) Order entered under Certification (lmc)
Related: [-] 309 Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on 2/26/21
314 314 motion Extend Deadline to File Schedules - Motion Fri 02/26 4:05 PM
Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules or Provide Required Information Filed by Knotel, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 3/18/2021 at 02:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 3/11/2021. (Mann, Tamara)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A- Proposed Order
Att: 2 Notice
313 313 order Appear pro hac vice Fri 02/26 12:37 PM
Order Approving Motion for Admission pro hac vice of Caitlin Toto Related [+] Signed on 2/26/2021. (LMC)
Related: [-] 302
312 312 order Appear pro hac vice Fri 02/26 12:36 PM
Order Approving Motion for Admission pro hac vice of Karen R. Zeituni Related [+] Signed on 2/26/2021. (LMC)
Related: [-] 301
311 311 order Appear pro hac vice Fri 02/26 12:35 PM
Order Approving Motion for Admission pro hac vice of Alan W. Kornberg Related [+] Signed on 2/26/2021. (LMC)
Related: [-] 300
310 310 court Request for Transcript Fri 02/26 11:41 AM
Request for Transcript of hearing held on February 26, 2021 received. To obtain a copy of this transcript, contact the Court Reporter/Transcriber Reliable Companies , Telephone number 3026548080 Related [+].
Related: [-] 309 liable Companies
309 309 21 pgs notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice Fri 02/26 9:10 AM
Second Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by Knotel, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 2/26/2021 at 10:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. (Talmo, Matthew)
Related: [-]