1640 Sepulveda LA LLC
Member Case
Lead case is: 1:21-bk-10146
Lead case is: 1:21-bk-10146
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Mary F Walrath |
Case #: | 1:21-bk-10177 |
Case Filed: | Jan 31, 2021 |
Terminated: | Jun 30, 2021 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Est. Liabilities | $50,000,001 to $100 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
1640 Sepulveda LA LLC
5 Union Sq W # 9
New York, NY 10003-3306 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
Docket last updated: 23 seconds ago |
Wednesday, June 30, 2021 | ||
court
Close Bankruptcy Case
Wed 06/30 10:31 AM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (LAM) |
||
Tuesday, June 29, 2021 | ||
6 | 6
2
pgs
order
Order
Tue 06/29 10:21 PM
Order Dismissing the Chapter 11 Cases of the Dismissed Debtors Signed on 6/29/2021 (LAM) |
|
Monday, March 15, 2021 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Schedules/Statements
Mon 03/15 3:59 PM
Schedules/Statements filed: , Stmt of Financial Affairs,. 1640 Sepulveda LA LLC Statements Filed by 1640 Sepulveda LA LLC. (Mann, Tamara) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Schedules/Statements
Mon 03/15 3:55 PM
Schedules/Statements filed: Sch A-B, Sch D, Sch E-F, Sch G, Sch H, , Sum of Assets and Liabilities, Decl Concerning Debtors Schs,. 1640 Sepulveda LA LLC Schedules Filed by 1640 Sepulveda LA LLC. (Mann, Tamara) |
|
Tuesday, February 02, 2021 | ||
3 | 3
order
Order-Joint Admin
Tue 02/02 12:09 PM
Order Directing Joint Administration of Chapter 11 Cases. An Order has been entered in accordance with rule 1015(b) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure and rule 1015-1 of the Local Rules of Bankruptcy Practice and Procedure of the United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Delaware directing joint administration of the chapter 11 cases of Knotel, Inc. and its affiliated debtors. The docket in the chapter 11 case of Knotel, Inc., Case No. 21-10146 (MFW), should be consulted for all matters affecting these cases. Signed on 2/2/2021 (LMC) |
|
Monday, February 01, 2021 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Joint Administration - Motion (Multi)
Mon 02/01 12:30 PM
Motion for Joint Administration Filed by 1330 Conn Ave DC LLC, 1407 Broadway NYC LLC, 142 Berkeley St BOS LLC, 1444 Market St SF LLC, 146 Geary St SF LLC, 152 W 25 NYC LLC, 1550 Bryant St SF LLC, 1556 20th LA LLC, 16 W 36 St NYC LLC, 1625 Oly Blvd LA LLC, 1640 Sepulveda LA LLC, 166 Geary St SF LLC, 1720 Eye St DC LLC, 1725 Montgomery St SF LLC, 19 W 44th NYC LLC, 195 Broadway NYC LLC, 2 Liberty Sq BOS LLC, 22 W 21 ST NYC LLC, 2228 Cottner LA LLC, 23 W 20th NYC LLC. (Dehney, Robert) |
|
court
Case Assigned
Mon 02/01 7:51 AM
Judge Mary F. Walrath added to case (LB) |
||
Sunday, January 31, 2021 | ||
1 | 1
37
pgs
misc
RETIRED - Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Sun 01/31 9:24 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition. Receipt Number O, Fee Amount $1738. Filed by 1640 Sepulveda LA LLC . (Dehney, Robert) |