Knotel 54 W 22nd LLC
Member Case
Lead case is: 1:21-bk-10146
Lead case is: 1:21-bk-10146
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Mary F Walrath |
Case #: | 1:21-bk-10321 |
Case Filed: | Jan 31, 2021 |
Terminated: | Jun 30, 2021 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Est. Liabilities | $50,000,001 to $100 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Knotel 54 W 22nd LLC
5 Union Sq W # 9
New York, NY 10003-3306 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
Docket last updated: 36 minutes ago |
Wednesday, June 30, 2021 | ||
court
Close Bankruptcy Case
Wed 06/30 2:21 PM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (LAM) |
||
Tuesday, June 29, 2021 | ||
6 | 6
2
pgs
order
Order
Tue 06/29 10:55 PM
Order Dismissing the Chapter 11 Cases of the Dismissed Debtors Signed on 6/29/2021 (LAM) |
|
Wednesday, March 17, 2021 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Schedules/Statements
Wed 03/17 9:40 PM
Schedules/Statements filed: , Stmt of Financial Affairs,. Knotel 54 W 22nd LLC - SOFA Filed by Knotel 54 W 22nd LLC. (Dehney, Robert) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Schedules/Statements
Wed 03/17 9:38 PM
Schedules/Statements filed: Sch A-B, Sch D, Sch E-F, Sch G, Sch H, , Sum of Assets and Liabilities, Decl Concerning Debtors Schs,. Knotel 54 W 22nd LLC - Schedules Filed by Knotel 54 W 22nd LLC. (Dehney, Robert) |
|
Tuesday, February 02, 2021 | ||
3 | 3
order
Order-Joint Admin
Tue 02/02 12:54 PM
Order Directing Joint Administration of Chapter 11 Cases. An Order has been entered in accordance with rule 1015(b) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure and rule 1015-1 of the Local Rules of Bankruptcy Practice and Procedure of the United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Delaware directing joint administration of the chapter 11 cases of Knotel, Inc. and its affiliated debtors. The docket in the chapter 11 case of Knotel, Inc., Case No. 21-10146 (MFW), should be consulted for all matters affecting these cases. Signed on 2/2/2021 (LMC) |
|
Monday, February 01, 2021 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Joint Administration - Motion (Multi)
Mon 02/01 1:14 PM
Motion for Joint Administration Filed by Knotel 41 USW LLC, Knotel 41 W 25 LLC, Knotel 417 Montgomery LLC, Knotel 419 PAS LLC, Knotel 43 W 24th LLC, Knotel 443 PAS LLC, Knotel 475 Park LLC, Knotel 49 Drumm LLC, Knotel 5 Hanover LLC, Knotel 5-9 USW LLC, Knotel 521 Broadway LLC, Knotel 530 Broadway LLC, Knotel 530 Seventh Avenue LLC, Knotel 54 W 21st LLC, Knotel 54 W 22nd LLC, Knotel 55 W 21St LLC, Knotel 550 Montgomery LLC, Knotel 551 Fifth Ave LLC, Knotel 560 LEXINGTON LLC, Knotel 575 8th Ave LLC. (Dehney, Robert) |
|
court
Case Assigned
Mon 02/01 8:07 AM
Judge Mary F. Walrath added to case (LB) |
||
Sunday, January 31, 2021 | ||
1 | 1
37
pgs
misc
RETIRED - Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Sun 01/31 11:14 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition. Receipt Number O, Fee Amount $1738. Filed by Knotel 54 W 22nd LLC . (Harvey, Matthew) |