Etienne v. United States of America et al
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Frederic Block |
Referred: | Ramon E Reyes, Jr |
Case #: | 1:21-cv-00613 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 28:2674 Federal Tort Claims Act |
Case Filed: | Feb 04, 2021 |
Terminated: | Aug 25, 2021 |
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 03, 2021 4:40 AM EDT |
Defendant
U.S. DEA Agent Antonio LoGrande
|
|
Defendant
United States of America
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Unknown U.S. Transportation Security Administration Officer
|
|
Plaintiff
Keddins Etienne
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Mediator
Hon. Steven M. Gold
Terminated: 07/29/2021
JAMS 34th Floor 620 Eighth Ave.
New York, NY 10018 |
Docket last updated: 04/22/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, August 26, 2021 | ||
20 | 20
order
Judgment - Clerk
Thu 08/26 4:03 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT, that the above-captioned action is dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Signed by Jalitza Poveda, Deputy Clerk on 8/26/2021) (Galeano, Sonia) |
|
Wednesday, August 25, 2021 | ||
19 | 19
2
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Wed 08/25 9:40 AM
STIPULATION and ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 8/25/2021. (Innelli, Michael) |
|
18 | 18
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Wed 08/25 8:28 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudic-e, Executed by the Parties and Respectfully Submitted for the Court's Endorsement, by United States of America (Speight, Melanie) |
|
Thursday, July 29, 2021 | ||
adr
Report of Mediation(Settled/Unsettled)
Thu 07/29 10:23 AM
REPORT of Mediation Settled Both parties must submit a Mediation Report which can be found at: https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/adr-forms. The Mediation Report must be e-mailed to nyed_adr@nyed.uscourts.gov within two weeks following mediation session. Mediation Report due by 8/12/2021. (Priftakis, Tina) |
||
order
Status Report Order
Thu 07/29 10:32 AM
STATUS REPORT ORDER: It has been reported that this case settled in mediation. By August 27, 2021 counsel shall either file their stipulation of settlement or a status report letter as to their settlement. Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 7/29/2021. (Innelli, Michael) |
||
order
~Util - Case Returned from Mediation
Thu 07/29 10:33 AM
Case returned from mediation. (Innelli, Michael) |
||
Wednesday, June 23, 2021 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
Wed 06/23 10:18 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER: The defendant's letter application17 with the consent of the plaintiff is GRANTED. The time to complete the mediation is extended to July 26, 2021. Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 6/23/2021. (Innelli, Michael) |
||
adr
Selection of Mediator
Wed 06/23 11:57 AM
SELECTION OF MEDIATOR: Steven M. Gold selected as Mediator. The first mediation session will take place on July 26, 2021. Fourteen days on or before the session date, counsel shall file with the Mediator their client's mediation statement summarizing the facts, legal issues, particulars of any prior settlement discussions, and the name and title of the client or client representative with full settlement authority who will attend the mediation in person. Attendance in person is required of the trial attorney, insurance adjuster, and client or client representative with full settlement authority. The Confidentiality Stipulation must be signed at the mediation session by all participants and the Mediator and returned via e-mail nyed_adr@nyed.uscourts.gov or fax (718) 613-2333. Contact information for the Mediator is on the docket sheet. Upon completion of the mediation, both parties must submit a Mediation Report which can be found at: https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/adr-forms. The Mediation Report must be e-mailed to nyed_adr@nyed.uscourts.gov within two weeks following mediation session. Report of Mediation due by 8/9/2021. (Priftakis, Tina) |
||
Tuesday, June 22, 2021 | ||
17 | 17
motion
Extension of Time to File Document
Tue 06/22 7:39 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File (Joint Motion to Extend the Parties' Deadline for Completing Mediation from July 17, 2021 until July 26, 2021, and Letter Advising Court of the Parties' Selected Mediator by United States of America. (Speight, Melanie) |
|
Tuesday, June 15, 2021 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Extension of Time to File Document
Tue 06/15 2:02 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File (Second Joint Motion to Extend the Parties' Deadline for Selecting a Mediator) by United States of America. (Speight, Melanie) |
|
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
Tue 06/15 2:06 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER: The defendant's second letter application16 with the consent of the plaintiff is GRANTED. The time to select a mediator is extended until June 22, 2021. Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 6/15/2021. (Innelli, Michael) |
||
Tuesday, June 01, 2021 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Extension of Time to File Document
Tue 06/01 2:53 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File (Joint Motion to Extend the Parties' Deadline for Selecting a Mediator) by United States of America. (Speight, Melanie) |
|
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
Tue 06/01 2:58 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER: The defendant's letter application15 with the consent of the plaintiff is GRANTED. The time to select a mediator is extended until June 15, 2021. Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 6/1/2021. (Innelli, Michael) |
||
Monday, May 17, 2021 | ||
minutes
Pre Motion Conference
Mon 05/17 4:22 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Frederic Block: Jonathan Corbett, Esq. for the plaintiff and Melanie Speight, Esq. for the defendants, all present. Telephone pre-motion conference held on 5/17/2009. Defendants anticipated motion to dismiss was discussed. The case is referred to court mediation. The court would like a report from the mediator whether the parties participated in good faith. (Court Reporter: Not Reported) (Innelli, Michael) |
||
order
Order Referring Case to Mediation
Mon 05/17 4:23 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Mediation shall be completed by 7/17/21.Selection of Mediator due by 5/31/2021. Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 5/17/2021. (Innelli, Michael) |
||
adr
Mediation Instructions
Mon 05/17 5:50 PM
MEDIATION INSTRUCTIONS for Counsel are available at: https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/adr-forms. Counsel are to select a mediator, schedule the first mediation session, and file the name of the mediator, date, time and place of the first mediation session via CM/ECF using the event Selection of Mediator. For a list of the EDNY Mediators and their qualifications, see the Court's website at https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/adr/Mediation/displayAll.cfm. EDNY Mediators are compensated in accordance with EDNY Local Civil Rule 83.8(f)(1)[formerly EDNY Local Civil Rule 83.11(f)(1)]. The Confidentiality Stipulation must be signed at the mediation session by all participants, including the mediator, and sent via email to Robyn_Weinstein@nyed.uscourts.gov. The Confidentiality Stipulation is available at: https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/adr-forms. Upon completion of the mediation, both parties must submit a Mediation Report which can be found at: https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/adr-forms. The Mediation Report must be e-mailed to nyed_adr@nyed.uscourts.gov within two weeks following mediation session. (Priftakis, Tina) |
||
Friday, May 14, 2021 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Letter
Fri 05/14 3:12 PM
Letter - Status Report & Request to Consider Early Discovery During Pre-Motion Conference by Keddins Etienne (Corbett, Jonathan) |
|
Tuesday, May 11, 2021 | ||
13 | 13
service
Summons Issued as to USA
Tue 05/11 9:59 AM
Summons Issued as to U.S. DEA Agent Antonio LoGrande, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Galeano, Sonia) |
|
Friday, May 07, 2021 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet
Fri 05/07 9:56 PM
Proposed Summons. by Keddins Etienne (Corbett, Jonathan) |
|
Tuesday, May 04, 2021 | ||
11 | 11
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Pre Motion Conference
Tue 05/04 12:53 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Defendant's letter application9 dated 4/26/21 is GRANTED. A telephone pre motion conference is scheduled for May 17, 2021 @ 4:00PM. The Court expects the parties to be conversant with the underlying facts and prepared to discuss the legal issues arising therefrom. The parties are reminded that they are obligated to discuss the prospect of settlement and may be required to provide the Court with a report of such discussions. If this date presents a conflict counsel shall first obtain the consent from all the parties to adjourn this telephone pre-motion conference and then file a letter application. All parties are directed to call 877-336-1839 then enter access code 7543641 at the time of the conference . Upon receipt of this email counsel shall confirm with each other of the date and time of this telephone pre-motion conference. Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 5/4/2021. (Innelli, Michael) |
|
utility
Set/Reset Hearings
Tue 05/04 12:54 PM
Set/Reset Hearings: Telephone Pre-Motion Conference set for 5/17/2021 04:00 PM before Judge Frederic Block. (Innelli, Michael) |
||
Tuesday, April 27, 2021 | ||
10 | 10
respm
Response to Motion
Tue 04/27 1:41 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re9 First MOTION for pre motion conference in Response to the Complaint filed by Keddins Etienne. (Corbett, Jonathan) |
|
Monday, April 26, 2021 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Pre Motion Conference
Mon 04/26 4:33 PM
First MOTION for pre motion conference in Response to the Complaint by United States of America. (Speight, Melanie) |
|
Friday, February 19, 2021 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Issued as to USA
Fri 02/19 10:52 AM
Summons Issued as to United States of America, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Galeano, Sonia) |
|
Thursday, February 18, 2021 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet
Thu 02/18 1:54 PM
Proposed Summons. by Keddins Etienne (Corbett, Jonathan) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 02/18 1:48 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Corbett on behalf of Keddins Etienne (notification declined or already on case) (Corbett, Jonathan) |
|
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Thu 02/18 1:38 PM
ORDER: Granting3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure the 150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerks Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee . Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 2/18/2021. (Innelli, Michael) |
||
Monday, February 08, 2021 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening
Mon 02/08 11:57 AM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Clerks Notice of Rule 73
Mon 02/08 11:56 AM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) |
|
Thursday, February 04, 2021 | ||
3 | 3
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Thu 02/04 7:16 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-14101032. by Keddins Etienne. (Corbett, Jonathan) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing | ||
2 | 2
misc
Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet
Thu 02/04 7:14 PM
Civil Cover Sheet.. by Keddins Etienne (Corbett, Jonathan) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 02/04 7:13 PM
COMPLAINT against U.S. DEA Agent Antonio LoGrande, United States of America, Unknown U.S. Transportation Security Administration Officer filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-14101009 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Keddins Etienne. (Corbett, Jonathan) |
|
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Mon 02/08 11:54 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Frederic Block and Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla) |