Morris v. Progressive Casualty Insurance Company
Louisiana Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Sarah S Vance |
Referred: | Dana Douglas |
Case #: | 2:21-cv-00245 |
Nature of Suit | 350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Tort/Motor Vehicle (P.I.) |
Case Filed: | Feb 05, 2021 |
Terminated: | Oct 04, 2022 |
Case in other court: | Civil District Court for the Parish of Orleans, 20-07484 |
Last checked: Wednesday Aug 04, 2021 3:20 AM CDT |
Defendant
Progressive Casualty Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
H Ladner Transport, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Chad Malone
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Progressive Gulf Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor
American Zurich Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor Defendant
H Ladner Transport, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor Defendant
Chad Malone
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor Defendant
Progressive Gulf Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor Defendant
State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Leslie Morris
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Thursday, February 02, 2023 | ||
78 | 78
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Thu 02/02 9:49 AM
ORDER granting77 Joint Motion to Dismiss With Prejudice. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 2/2/2023. (mm) |
|
Tuesday, January 31, 2023 | ||
77 | 77
motion
Dismiss
Tue 01/31 9:44 AM
EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice by H Ladner Transport, LLC, Chad Malone, Progressive Gulf Insurance Company.(DeRouen, Patrick) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order |