OneBeacon America Insurance Company v. Allstate Insurance Company
Massachusetts District Court | |
Judge: | Leo T Sorokin |
Case #: | 1:14-cv-12562 |
Nature of Suit | 896 Other Statutes - Arbitration |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract |
Case Filed: | Jun 18, 2014 |
Terminated: | Jun 29, 2015 |
Last checked: Monday Jan 19, 2015 4:47 PM EST |
Defendant
Allstate Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
OneBeacon America Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Employers Commercial Union Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Employers Liability Assurance Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, June 29, 2015 | ||
35 | 35
order
Order
Mon 06/29 9:46 AM
District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: CLOSING ORDER entered. re34 Order on Motion for Order (Simeone, Maria) |
|
34 | 34
order
Order on Motion for Order
Mon 06/29 9:20 AM
District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: CONSENT ORDER entered. granting33 Motion for Order to confirm arbitration award (Simeone, Maria) |
|
Friday, June 26, 2015 | ||
33 | 33
motion
Order
Fri 06/26 4:46 PM
Joint MOTION for Order to Confirm Arbitration Award by OneBeacon America Insurance Company.(O'Connor, Kevin) |
|
32 | 32
order
Order on Motion to Seal Document
Fri 06/26 4:35 PM
District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting31 Motion to file under Seal exhibits to the parties joint motion to confirm arbitration award. (Simeone, Maria) |
|
31 | 31
motion
Seal Document
Fri 06/26 11:57 AM
Joint MOTION to Seal Document (Joint Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Exhibits to the Parties Joint Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award) by Allstate Insurance Company.(Hincks, Benjamin) |
|
Friday, June 19, 2015 | ||
30 | 30
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines ~Util - Set Scheduling Order Deadlines
Fri 06/19 9:10 AM
District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. Per the parties' joint request, the stay is LIFTED and they shall make their joint filing by June 26, 2015 as proposed. ( Joint Status Report due by 6/26/2015)(Montes, Mariliz) |
|
Thursday, June 18, 2015 | ||
29 | 29
misc
Status Report
Thu 06/18 2:18 PM
STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report by Employers Commercial Union Insurance Company, Employers Liability Assurance Corporation, OneBeacon America Insurance Company. (Knoerzer, Michael) |
|
Tuesday, February 17, 2015 | ||
28 | 28
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines
Tue 02/17 10:28 AM
District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. The parties shall file a further joint status report upon the earlier of ten days after the arbitration decision or June 1, 2015. re27 Letter/request (non-motion), ( Status Report due by 6/1/2015)(Simeone, Maria) |
|
Friday, February 13, 2015 | ||
27 | 27
misc
Letter/request - non-motion
Fri 02/13 1:03 PM
Letter/request (non-motion) Joint Status Report . (Knoerzer, Michael) |
|
Friday, February 06, 2015 | ||
26 | 26
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines
Fri 02/06 3:26 PM
District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. The parties shall file a joint status report by close of business on 2/13/15. re 24 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, ( Status Report due by 2/13/2015)(Simeone, Maria) |
|
Thursday, October 16, 2014 | ||
25 | 25 Set/Reset Deadlines: stayed until the underlyingarbitration concludes in or about January, 2015. (Simeone, Maria) Modified on 10/16/2014 (Simeone, Maria). | |
Tuesday, August 19, 2014 | ||
24 | 24 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting23 Motion Stay proceedings until underlying arbitration concludes. (Simeone, Maria) | |
Friday, August 15, 2014 | ||
23 | 23 Joint MOTION for Entry of an Order Staying the Proceedings by Allstate Insurance Company.(Hincks, Benjamin) | |
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Monday, July 07, 2014 | ||
22 | 22 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting21 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Michael A. Knoerzer. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Simeone, Maria) | |
21 | 21 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Michael Knoerzer Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-5088077 by OneBeacon America Insurance Company.(Stineback, Jennifer) | |
Att: 1 Affidavit in Support of Pro Hac Vice | ||
Thursday, July 03, 2014 | ||
20 | 20 STIPULATION Accepting Service of the Petition to Confirm the Arbitration Award and for Extension of Time to Respond to Petition to Confirm the Arbitration Award by Allstate Insurance Company. (Hincks, Benjamin) | |
Monday, June 30, 2014 | ||
19 | 19 REDACTED EXHIBITS to4 Declaration by Allstate Insurance Company.(Simeone, Maria) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 3 | ||
18 | 18 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered; The Motion is ALLOWED IN PART as set forth in this Electronic Order. The Clerk shall file on the public docket the redacted exhibits (1-3) attached to the Motion which will be the publicly available copies of the petition, the memorandum and declaration filed by the Plaintiff. The original unredacted copies of those documents shall remain sealed. This ruling (and the Court's earlier allowance of the Motion to Seal) does not establish that the Court will necessarily redact from disclosure portions of its opinion or order on the merits of this lawsuit. The Court will consider the parties' views on that matter in the course of its ruling on the merits. Insofar as the parties request a return of the sealed documents, that request is DENIED as they constitute part of the official record of the proceedings. re17 Motion return of the sealed documents, (Simeone, Maria) Modified on 6/30/2014 (Simeone, Maria). | |
Friday, June 27, 2014 | ||
17 | 17 MOTION in Support of Impoundment (Unopposed) by Allstate Insurance Company.(Hincks, Benjamin) (Attachment 4 replaced on 6/30/2014) (Simeone, Maria). | |
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Redacted, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Redacted, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - Redacted, | ||
Att: 4 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, June 26, 2014 | ||
16 | 16 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting15 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Neal R. Novak. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Simeone, Maria) | |
Wednesday, June 25, 2014 | ||
15 | 15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Neal R. Novak Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-5074033 by Allstate Insurance Company.(Hincks, Benjamin) | |
14 | 14 Response by Allstate Insurance Company to 10 Order on Motion to Seal,, (Consent to Motion for Leave to File Under Seal) . (Hincks, Benjamin) | |
13 | 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Allstate Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent The Allstate Corporation for Allstate Insurance Company.. (Hincks, Benjamin) | |
12 | 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Claire S. Schneider on behalf of Allstate Insurance Company (Schneider, Claire) | |
11 | 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin L. Hincks on behalf of Allstate Insurance Company (Hincks, Benjamin) | |
Monday, June 23, 2014 | ||
10 | 10 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered.The Motion to Seal is ALLOWED AS UNOPPOSED subject to the following. Defendant shall file a written statement of its assent no later than close of business Wednesday June 25, 2014. By close of business Friday June 27, 2014, the parties shall file a redacted public copy of the sealed filings and an explanation of why the specific items redacted must remain sealed and should not be public.re8 Motion to Seal (Simeone, Maria) Modified on 6/23/2014 (Simeone, Maria). | |
9 | 9 3 pgs MEMORANDUM in Support re8 MOTION to Seal filed by OneBeacon America Insurance Company.(O'Connor, Kevin) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit Exh A | ||
8 | 8 MOTION to Seal by OneBeacon America Insurance Company.(O'Connor, Kevin) | |
Friday, June 20, 2014 | ||
7 | 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer L. Stineback on behalf of OneBeacon America Insurance Company (Stineback, Jennifer) | |
Thursday, June 19, 2014 | ||
6 | 6 Summons Issued as to Allstate Insurance Company. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Abaid, Kimberly) | |
5 | 5 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Leo T. Sorokin assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Abaid, Kimberly) | |
Wednesday, June 18, 2014 | ||
4 | 4 DECLARATION re1 Complaint,2 Memorandum of Law of Michael A. Knoerzer by OneBeacon America Insurance Company.(O'Connor, Kevin) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 | ||
3 | 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by OneBeacon America Insurance Company. (O'Connor, Kevin) | |
2 | 2 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by OneBeacon America Insurance Company to1 Complaint,. (O'Connor, Kevin) | |
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against Allstate Insurance Company Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-5063314 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by OneBeacon America Insurance Company.(O'Connor, Kevin) | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Category Form |