Nelson J Chatelain and Charlene L Chatelain
Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Jack Caddell |
Case #: | 8:92-bk-81161 |
Case Filed: | May 20, 1992 |
Creditor Meeting: | Jul 17, 1992 |
Terminated: | Aug 07, 2014 |
Plan Confirmed: | Nov 23, 1993 |
Discharge Objection Deadline: | Sep 15, 1992 |
Debtor
Nelson J Chatelain
7705 Oakridge Dr SE
Huntsville, AL 35802-2741 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Charlene L Chatelain
7705 Oakridge Drive, SE
Huntsville, AL 35802 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Trustee
Stuart M Maples
Maples and Ray P.C. 401 Holmes Avenue, NE Suite H
Huntsville, AL 35801 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 60 minutes ago |
Thursday, August 07, 2014 | ||
322 | 322 Order Discharging Standing Trustee, Releasing Bond Liability and Closing Case: It appearing to the Court that the trustee in this case has performed all of the duties required of him in the administration of this case; that he has made distribution by order of this Court, and has rendered a full and complete account thereof, and no adverse interest being represented; It is therefore ORDERED that the Ch 11 trustee be discharged and relieved of his trust, and that he and the sureties on this bond be released from further liability thereunder; It is further Ordered that this case be, and the same is hereby CLOSED. U.S. Bankruptcy Judge (Non-Image Entry) (mmb) | |
Bankruptcy Case Closed (mmb) |