New York Southern District Court
Judge:George B Daniels
Case #: 1:21-cv-01236
Nature of Suit850 Other Statutes - Securities/Commodities/Exchange
Cause28:1331sv Fed. Question: Securities Violation
Case Filed:Feb 11, 2021
Last checked: Thursday Feb 11, 2021 3:15 PM EST
Defendant
Jose Maria Alapont
Defendant
Troy A. Clarke
Defendant
Stephen R. D'Arcy
Defendant
Jeffrey A. Dokho
Defendant
Vincent J. Intrieri
Defendant
Navistar International Corporation
Defendant
Mark H. Rachesky
Defendant
Christian Schulz
Defendant
Kevin M. Sheehan
Defendant
Dennis A. Suskind
Defendant
Janet T. Yeung
Plaintiff
Victor Arnold
Represented By
Joshua M. Lifshitz
Lifshitz Law Firm, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 02/23/2021 11:59 PM EST
Tuesday, February 23, 2021
utility Case Accepted as Related Tue 02/23 2:26 PM
CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:21-cv-00453-GBD. Notice of Assignment to follow. (laq)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Case Assignment/Reassignment Tue 02/23 2:29 PM
NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge George B. Daniels. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (laq)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Tue 02/23 2:35 PM
Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (laq)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 12, 2021
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Fri 02/12 9:34 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. .(jgo)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Fri 02/12 9:35 AM
Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
Related: [-]
utility Case Referred as Possibly Related/Similar Fri 02/12 9:35 AM
CASE REFERRED TO Judge George B. Daniels as possibly related to 21-cv-453. (jgo)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 11, 2021
3 3 misc Statement of Relatedness Thu 02/11 2:33 PM
STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 21cv453 Document filed by Victor Arnold..(Lifshitz, Joshua)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Thu 02/11 2:33 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Lifshitz, Joshua)
Related: [-]
1 1 14 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 02/11 2:32 PM
COMPLAINT against Jose Maria Alapont, Troy A. Clarke, Stephen R. D'Arcy, Jeffrey A. Dokho, Vincent J. Intrieri, Navistar International Corporation, Mark H. Rachesky, Christian Schulz, Kevin M. Sheehan, Dennis A. Suskind, Janet T. Yeung. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-23901371)Document filed by Victor Arnold..(Lifshitz, Joshua)
Related: [-]