Williams v. Sonoma Plant Works, Inc.
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Vernon S Broderick |
Case #: | 1:21-cv-01263 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question |
Case Filed: | Feb 11, 2021 |
Terminated: | Apr 15, 2021 |
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 10, 2021 4:34 AM EDT |
Defendant
Sonoma Plant Works, Inc.
235 Classic Ct
Rohnert Park, CA 94928 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Milton Williams
On Behalf Of Himself And All Other Persons Similarly Situated c/o Gottlieb & Associates 150 East 18th Street Suite PHR
New York, NY 10003 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, May 06, 2021 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Thu 05/06 12:00 PM
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice and without costs against the defendant(s) Sonoma Plant Works, Inc.. Document filed by Milton Williams. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). ..(LaBollita, Michael) |
|
Thursday, April 15, 2021 | ||
11 | 11
1
pgs
order
Order of Discontinuance
Thu 04/15 5:20 PM
ORDER: It has been reported to the Court that the parties in this case have reached a settlement agreement. Accordingly, it is hereby: ORDERED that the above-captioned action is discontinued without costs to any party and without prejudice to restoring the action to this Court's docket if the application to restore the action is made within thirty (30) days. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 4/15/2021) (ama) |
|
Wednesday, April 14, 2021 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Settlement
Wed 04/14 12:05 PM
NOTICE of Settlement with prejudice . Document filed by Milton Williams..(Gottlieb, Jeffrey) |
|
Friday, March 19, 2021 | ||
9 | 9
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Fri 03/19 1:40 PM
ORDER granting8 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re8 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Kristin Grant dated March 18, 2021.. APPLICATION GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 3/19/2021) Sonoma Plant Works, Inc. answer due 4/19/2021 (ks) |
|
Thursday, March 18, 2021 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Thu 03/18 2:50 PM
FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Kristin Grant dated March 18, 2021. Document filed by Sonoma Plant Works, Inc...(Grant, Kristin) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 03/18 2:47 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kristin Alanna Grant on behalf of Sonoma Plant Works, Inc...(Grant, Kristin) |
|
Sunday, March 07, 2021 | ||
6 | 6
service
Affidavit of Service Complaints
Sun 03/07 3:51 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Sonoma Plant Works, Inc. served on 2/26/2021, answer due 3/19/2021. Service was accepted by Stacey Skaggs, Sales. Document filed by Milton Williams..(Gottlieb, Jeffrey) |
|
Friday, February 12, 2021 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Fri 02/12 1:34 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Sonoma Plant Works, Inc...(dnh) |
|
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction
Fri 02/12 1:22 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Michael A. LaBollita. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Fee Status code due (due). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid). (dnh) |
||
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Fri 02/12 1:26 PM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Vernon S. Broderick. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(dnh) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Fri 02/12 1:27 PM
Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (dnh) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Fri 02/12 1:27 PM
Case Designated ECF. (dnh) |
||
Thursday, February 11, 2021 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 02/11 9:45 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jeffrey Michael Gottlieb on behalf of Milton Williams..(Gottlieb, Jeffrey) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Thu 02/11 9:01 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(LaBollita, Michael) |
|
2 | 2
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Thu 02/11 9:01 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Sonoma Plant Works, Inc., re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Milton Williams..(LaBollita, Michael) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 02/11 9:00 PM
COMPLAINT against Sonoma Plant Works, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-23908000)Document filed by Milton Williams..(LaBollita, Michael) |