New York Southern District Court
Judge:Paul G Gardephe
Case #: 1:21-mc-00179
CauseM 08-85 Motion to Compel
Case Filed:Feb 12, 2021

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 02/23/2021 11:59 PM EST
Tuesday, February 23, 2021
9 9 order Order on Motion to Transfer Case Tue 02/23 3:44 PM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting6 MOTION to Transfer Case / NOTICE OF CWCAPITAL COBALT VR LTD.S UNOPPOSED MOTION TO TRANSFER PROCEEDING TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE DISTRICT OF MINNESOTA. ENDORSEMENT: This Application is granted. This matter is transferred to the U.S. District Court for the District of Minnesota. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 2/23/2021) (jca)
Related: [-]
8 8 respm Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion Tue 02/23 11:05 AM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re:1 MISCELLANEOUS CASE INITIATING DOCUMENT - MOTION to Compel Venable LLP to Produce Documents . Other Court Name: United States District Court - District of Minnesota. Other Court Case Number: 0:19-cv-1387, 0:19-cv-2416. (Filing Fee $ 4 . Document filed by CWCapital Asset Management, Venable LLP..(Cross, Gregory)
Related: [-]
7 7 respm Declaration in Opposition to Motion Tue 02/23 11:04 AM
DECLARATION of Gregory A. Cross in Opposition re:1 MISCELLANEOUS CASE INITIATING DOCUMENT - MOTION to Compel Venable LLP to Produce Documents . Other Court Name: United States District Court - District of Minnesota. Other Court Case Number: 0:19-cv-1387, 0:19-cv-2416. (Filing Fee $ 4. Document filed by CWCapital Asset Management, Venable LLP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1).(Cross, Gregory)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Case Assignment/Reassignment Tue 02/23 11:19 AM
NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Paul G. Gardephe. Judge Lewis A. Kaplan is no longer assigned to the case..(wb)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 22, 2021
6 6 motion Transfer Case Mon 02/22 4:39 PM
MOTION to Transfer Case / NOTICE OF CWCAPITAL COBALT VR LTD.S UNOPPOSED MOTION TO TRANSFER PROCEEDING TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE DISTRICT OF MINNESOTA . Document filed by CWCapital Cobalt Vr Ltd...(Pickhardt, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 18, 2021
5 5 misc Statement of Relatedness Thu 02/18 4:05 PM
STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 1:21-mc-00175. Document filed by CWCapital Cobalt Vr Ltd...(Pickhardt, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 16, 2021
utility Case Designated ECF Tue 02/16 5:17 AM
Case Designated ECF. (bcu)
Related: [-]
notice Miscellaneous Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Tue 02/16 5:19 AM
MISCELLANEOUS CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:http://https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] . .(bcu)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 12, 2021
4 4 misc Miscellaneous Cover Sheet Fri 02/12 5:48 PM
MISCELLANEOUS COVER SHEET filed..(Pickhardt, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
3 3 respm Declaration in Support of Motion Fri 02/12 5:47 PM
DECLARATION of Jonathan E. Pickhardt in Support re:1 MISCELLANEOUS CASE INITIATING DOCUMENT - MOTION to Compel Venable LLP to Produce Documents . Other Court Name: United States District Court - District of Minnesota. Other Court Case Number: 0:19-cv-1387, 0:19-cv-2416. (Filing Fee $ 4. Document filed by CWCapital Cobalt Vr Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C).(Pickhardt, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
2 2 17 pgs respm Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Fri 02/12 5:46 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:1 MISCELLANEOUS CASE INITIATING DOCUMENT - MOTION to Compel Venable LLP to Produce Documents . Other Court Name: United States District Court - District of Minnesota. Other Court Case Number: 0:19-cv-1387, 0:19-cv-2416. (Filing Fee $ 4 . Document filed by CWCapital Cobalt Vr Ltd...(Pickhardt, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
1 1 motion Compel Fri 02/12 5:44 PM
MISCELLANEOUS CASE INITIATING DOCUMENT - MOTION to Compel Venable LLP to Produce Documents . Other Court Name: United States District Court - District of Minnesota. Other Court Case Number: 0:19-cv-1387, 0:19-cv-2416. (Filing Fee $ 49.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-23921275)Document filed by CWCapital Cobalt Vr Ltd..(Pickhardt, Jonathan)
Related: [-]