LEE et al v. TRUMP et al
District Of Columbia District Court | |
Judge: | Amit P Mehta |
Case #: | 1:21-cv-00400 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Feb 16, 2021 |
Last checked: Sunday Aug 15, 2021 5:16 AM EDT |
Amicus
CAMPAIGN LEGAL CENTER ACTION
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
DONALD J. TRUMP
solely in his personal capacity Mar-A-Lago 1100 S. Ocean Blvd.
Palm Beach, FL 33480 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
OATH KEEPERS
1030 E. Hwy 377 Suite 110-285
Granbury, TX 76048 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
PROUD BOYS INTERNATIONAL, L.L.C.
108 Durango Dr.
Crossroads, TX 76227 |
|
Defendant
RUDOLPH W. GIULIANI
Rudolph W. Giuliani PLLC 445 Park Ave Floor 18
New York, NY 10022 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
WARBOYS LLC
|
|
Defendant
ENRIQUE TARRIO
|
|
Movant
FLOYD ABRAMS
|
Represented By
|
Movant
LAURENCE H. TRIBE
|
Represented By
|
Movant
EVAN H. CAMINKER
|
Represented By
|
Movant
ERWIN CHEMERINSKY
|
Represented By
|
Movant
JARED HOLT
|
Represented By
|
Movant
ANDREW KENT
|
Represented By
|
Movant
MARTHA MINOW
|
Represented By
|
Movant
SHELDON NAHMOD
|
Represented By
|
Movant
DAPHNA RENAN
|
Represented By
|
Movant
PETER M. SHANE
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
MAXINE WATERS
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JERROLD NADLER
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
BARBARA J. LEE
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
MARCIA KAPTUR
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
HENRY C. JOHNSON
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
PRAMILA JAYAPAL
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
VERONICA ESCOBAR
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
BONNIE WATSON COLEMAN
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
STEPHEN I COHEN
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
KAREN R. BASS
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
BENNIE G. THOMPSON
Hon., in his personal capacity 2466 Rayburn House Office Building U.S. House of Representatives
Washington, DC 20515 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
106 | 106
9
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Stay
Thu 04/18 2:26 PM
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying Defendant Trump's90 Motion for Stay and denying as moot Defendant Tarrio's91 Motion to Join Defendant Trump's Motion for Stay. See the attached Memorandum Opinion and Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 04/18/2024. (lcapm3) |
|
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Mon 04/15 10:03 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 5/10/2024 (Associated Cases: 1:21-cv-00400-APM and 1:21-cv-02265-APM) (lsj) |
||
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
order
.Order
Fri 04/12 6:22 PM
MINUTE ORDER. Defendant Russell Taylor and Plaintiffs in Smith v. Trump , 21-cv-2265 (APM), shall file an additional Joint Status Report by May 10, 2024, concerning the status of settlement, unless a stipulation of dismissal is filed on or before that date. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 04/12/2024. (lcapm3) |
||
MINUTE ORDER. Defendant Russell Taylor and Plaintiffs in Smith v. Trump , 21-cv-2265 (APM), shall file an additional Joint Status Report by May 10, 2024, concerning the status of settlement, unless a stipulation of dismissal is filed on or before that date. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 04/12/2024. (lcapm3) Associated Cases: 1:21-cv-00400-APM, 1:21-cv-02265-APM | ||
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
105 | 105
misc
Status Report
Thu 04/11 12:44 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT by RUSSELL TAYLOR and by REGINALD CLEVELAND, JASON DEROCHE, BYRON EVANS, MICHAEL FORTUNE, GOVERNOR LATSON, MELISSA MARSHALL, DANNY MCELROY, CONRAD SMITH. (Epstein, Marc) |