New York Southern District Court
Judge:Andrew L Carter, Jr
Case #: 1:21-cv-01356
Nature of Suit230 Real Property - Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause28:1332 Diversity Action
Case Filed:Feb 16, 2021
Case in other court:Supreme Court of the State of New York, NY County, 650212/2021
Last checked: Tuesday Feb 16, 2021 4:10 PM EST
Defendant
Town Sports International Holdings, Inc.
Plaintiff
429-441 86TH STREET LLC


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Wednesday, February 17, 2021
7 7 notice Notice of Removal Wed 02/17 1:10 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from from Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of New York. Case Number: 650212/2021. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-23973259).Document filed by Town Sports International Holdings, Inc...(D'Angelo, Massimo)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - notice of motion for summary judgment in lieu of complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Guaranty dated as of August 2006 and reaffirmed as of August 31, 2020,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Plaintiffs Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment in Lieu of Complaint, dated January 11, 2021,
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Affidavit of Jeff Sutton, dated January 11, 2021,
Att: 5 Exhibit E - Lease dated as of August 2007,
Att: 6 Exhibit F - affidavit of service in the State Court Action,
Att: 7 Exhibit G (Part 1 of 2) - requisite papers filed in the State Court Action,
Att: 8 Exhibit G (Part 2 of 2) - requisite papers filed in the State Court Action
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Pleading Wed 02/17 11:53 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Massimo Fabio D'Angelo to RE-FILE Document No. 1 Notice of Removal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Notice of Removal exhibits must be labeled and filed as attachments to the notice of removal pursuant to ECF Filing Rule 13.3. Exhibits cannot be labeled Exhibit A, Exhibit B, etc.. Re-file the pleading using the event type Notice of Removal found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (dnh)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification Wed 02/17 12:02 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Massimo Fabio D'Angelo. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: 429-441 86TH STREET LLC. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps. (dnh)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Pleading Wed 02/17 12:07 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Massimo Fabio D'Angelo to RE-FILE Document No. 4 Amended Notice of Removal,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong event type was used to file the pleading; this is not an Amended pleading. Re-file the pleading using the event type Notice of Removal found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. If the deficiency/deficiencies are not corrected within five (5) days per Amended Standing Order 15-mc-00131 this case will be administratively closed. Initial Pleading due by 2/22/2021. (dnh)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Wed 02/17 2:23 PM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(dnh)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Wed 02/17 2:24 PM
Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (dnh)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Wed 02/17 2:24 PM
Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 16, 2021
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 02/16 5:26 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Angad Bhai on behalf of Town Sports International Holdings, Inc...(Bhai, Angad)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 02/16 4:54 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Massimo Fabio D'Angelo on behalf of Town Sports International Holdings, Inc...(D'Angelo, Massimo)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Amended Notice of Removal Tue 02/16 4:53 PM
AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL against 429-441 86TH STREET LLC; amending1 Notice of Removal,.Document filed by Town Sports International Holdings, Inc.. Related document:1 Notice of Removal,..(D'Angelo, Massimo)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 02/16 4:22 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Town Sports International Holdings, Inc...(D'Angelo, Massimo)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Tue 02/16 4:18 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(D'Angelo, Massimo)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Tue 02/16 4:16 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of New York. Case Number: 650212/2021. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-23958445).Document filed by Town Sports International Holdings, Inc...(D'Angelo, Massimo)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit F,
Att: 7 Exhibit G (Part 1 of 2),
Att: 8 Exhibit G (Part 2 of 2)