New York Southern District Court
Judge:Paul G Gardephe
Referred: Stewart D Aaron
Case #: 1:21-cv-01364
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12102 Americans with Disabilities Act (ADA) Disability Definition
Case Filed:Feb 16, 2021
Last checked: Tuesday Feb 16, 2021 6:13 PM EST
Defendant
Thera Group, LLC
Plaintiff
Kareem Nisbett
Represented By
Douglas Brian Lipsky
Lipsky Lowe LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Wednesday, February 24, 2021
5 5 service Summons Issued Wed 02/24 12:36 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Thera Group, LLC..(sj)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 18, 2021
4 4 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Thu 02/18 10:44 AM
ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 2/18/2021) (jca)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 17, 2021
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification Wed 02/17 10:20 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Douglas Brian Lipsky. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Kareem Nisbett. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted;. (gp)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Wed 02/17 10:23 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul G. Gardephe. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(gp)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Wed 02/17 10:31 AM
Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (gp)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Wed 02/17 10:31 AM
Case Designated ECF. (gp)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 16, 2021
3 3 service Request for Issuance of Summons Tue 02/16 5:58 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Thera Group, LLC dba ZShield, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Kareem Nisbett..(Lipsky, Douglas)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Tue 02/16 5:56 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Lipsky, Douglas)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 02/16 5:54 PM
COMPLAINT against Thera Group, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-23960855)Document filed by Kareem Nisbett..(Lipsky, Douglas)
Related: [-]