California Grocers Association v. City of San Leandro
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Vince Chhabria |
Case #: | 3:21-cv-01175 |
Nature of Suit | 950 Other Statutes - Constitutionality of State Statutes |
Cause | 29:151 Labor: Review of Agency Action |
Case Filed: | Feb 17, 2021 |
Terminated: | Aug 06, 2021 |
Last checked: Monday Aug 16, 2021 1:27 AM PDT |
Defendant
City of San Leandro
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
California Grocers Association
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Friday, August 06, 2021 | ||
27 | 27
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Fri 08/06 1:57 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Under Rule 41 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by California Grocers Association (Tarantino, William) |
|
Friday, July 16, 2021 | ||
26 | 26
4
pgs
order
Order on Stipulation
Fri 07/16 3:24 PM
Order by Judge Vince Chhabria granting 25 Stipulation to Extend Deadline to Respond to First Amended Complaint. (vclc3S, COURT STAFF) |
|
Thursday, July 15, 2021 | ||
25 | 25
motion
Stipulation and Proposed Order
Thu 07/15 4:39 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re24 Amended Complaint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order to Extend Deadline to Respond to First Amended Complaint filed by City of San Leandro. (Nazareth, Matthew) |
|
Friday, June 25, 2021 | ||
24 | 24
cmp
Amended Complaint
Fri 06/25 5:10 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against City of San Leandro. Filed byCalifornia Grocers Association. (Tarantino, William) |
|
Monday, June 21, 2021 | ||
23 | 23
5
pgs
order
Order on Stipulation
Mon 06/21 7:18 PM
ORDER AS MODIFIED by Judge Vince Chhabria granting 19 Stipulation to Vacate Case Management Conference. The Case Management Conference scheduled for June 23, 2021, is continued to September 29, 2021. Case Management Statement due by 9/22/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/29/2021 02:00 PM in San Francisco, - To be determined.(vclc3S, COURT STAFF) |
|
22 | 22
4
pgs
order
Order on Stipulation
Mon 06/21 7:06 PM
Order by Judge Vince Chhabria granting 21 Stipulation Regarding Amended Complaint. Amended Pleadings due by 7/1/2021. (vclc3S, COURT STAFF) |
|
Thursday, June 17, 2021 | ||
21 | 21
motion
Stipulation and Proposed Order
Thu 06/17 5:19 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Joint Stipulation and Proposed Order Regarding Amended Complaint filed by California Grocers Association. (Tarantino, William) |
|
Wednesday, June 16, 2021 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Joint Case Management Statement
Wed 06/16 4:49 PM
JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by City of San Leandro. (Nazareth, Matthew) |
|
Friday, June 11, 2021 | ||
19 | 19
motion
Stipulation and Proposed Order
Fri 06/11 12:26 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 15 Clerk's Notice,,,,,,, Util - Teleconference Zoom,,,,,, Stipulation and [Proposed] Order to Vacate Case Management Conference filed by City of San Leandro. (Nazareth, Matthew) |
|
Tuesday, May 18, 2021 | ||
18 | 18
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 05/18 3:38 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Richard Delmendo PioRoda (PioRoda, Richard) |
|
17 | 17
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 05/18 3:09 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer L Riggs (Riggs, Jennifer) |
|
16 | 16
5
pgs
order
Order on Stipulation
Tue 05/18 11:00 AM
ORDER AS MODIFIED by Judge Vince Chhabria granting 14 Stipulation re Case Management Conference and Complaint.(vclc3S, COURT STAFF) |
|
Monday, May 17, 2021 | ||
15 | 15
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice ~Util - Teleconference Zoom
Mon 05/17 3:22 PM
REASSIGNED CASE - NOTICE OF NEW HEARING DATE: You are notified that the Court has scheduled an Initial Case Management Conference before Judge Vince Chhabria upon reassignment. For a copy of Judge Chhabria's Standing Order and other information, please refer to the Court's website at www.cand.uscourts.gov. Case Management Statement due by 6/16/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/23/2021, 02:00 PM, by Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/vc] Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at vccrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than Thursday, June 17, 2021, by no later 10:00 a.m. General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/] . < I> (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (knmS, COURT STAFF) |
|
Wednesday, April 28, 2021 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Stipulation and Proposed Order
Wed 04/28 10:28 AM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re1 Complaint,7 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines, filed by City of San Leandro. (Nazareth, Matthew) |
|
13 | 13
1
pgs
order
Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned
Wed 04/28 9:52 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Vince Chhabria for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by The Clerk on 4/28/21.(haS, COURT STAFF) |
|
Att: 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording | ||
Tuesday, April 27, 2021 | ||
12 | 12
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text Only
Tue 04/27 3:15 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (shyS, COURT STAFF) |
|
Monday, April 26, 2021 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Mon 04/26 2:46 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by California Grocers Association.. (Tarantino, William) |
|
Tuesday, April 13, 2021 | ||
10 | 10
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination
Tue 04/13 12:08 PM
CLERK'S SECOND NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF Re: Consent or Declination. Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge 4/27/2021. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (shyS, COURT STAFF) |
|
Wednesday, March 17, 2021 | ||
9 | 9
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination
Wed 03/17 8:04 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF Re: Consent or Declination. Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 3/31/2021. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (shyS, COURT STAFF) |
|
Thursday, February 18, 2021 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures
Thu 02/18 1:39 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by California Grocers Association Correction of Docket # 5 (Tarantino, William) |
|
7 | 7
order
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
Thu 02/18 12:29 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/14/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/21/2021 02:00 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. (arkS, COURT STAFF) |
|
6 | 6
service
Summons Issued
Thu 02/18 12:27 PM
Summons Issued as to City of San Leandro. (arkS, COURT STAFF) |
|
utility
Electronic Filing Error
Thu 02/18 12:25 PM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . Incorrect case number listed. This filing will not be processed by the clerks office.Please re-file in its entirety. Re:5 Certificate of Interested Ent ities filed by California Grocers Association (arkS, COURT STAFF) |
||
Wednesday, February 17, 2021 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures
Wed 02/17 3:47 PM
*Please see8 for corrected filing* Corporate Disclosure Statement by California Grocers Association Plaintiff California Grocers Association's Corporate Disclosure Statement (Tarantino, William) Modified on 2/18/2021 (arkS, COURT STAFF). |
|
4 | 4
notice
Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures
Wed 02/17 3:45 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by California Grocers Association identifying Other Affiliate Albertsons Companies, Inc., Other Affiliate The Save Mart Companies for California Grocers Association. (Tarantino, William) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Proposed Summons
Wed 02/17 3:38 PM
Proposed Summons. (Tarantino, William) |
|
2 | 2
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Wed 02/17 3:22 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 3/3/2021. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) |
|
1 | 1
24
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Wed 02/17 3:04 PM
COMPLAINT Complaint For Declaratory And Injunctive Relief against City of San Leandro ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-15587224.). Filed byCalifornia Grocers Association.(Tarantino, William) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |