New York Southern District Court
Judge:Lewis J Liman
Case #: 1:21-cv-01486
Nature of Suit350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle
Cause28:1364 Auto Negligence
Case Filed:Feb 18, 2021
Last checked: Friday Feb 19, 2021 1:10 AM EST
All Defendants
UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
86 Chambers St.
New York, NY 10007
All Plaintiffs
Dahlia Damas
11 Park Place Suite 1008
New York, NY 10007
Represented By
Steven Peri Seener
Seener & Seener, Esqs.
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/03/2021 11:59 PM EST
Friday, February 19, 2021
5 5 misc Civil Cover Sheet Fri 02/19 2:35 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Seener, Steven)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons Issued Fri 02/19 2:10 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Of America..(dnh)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification Fri 02/19 1:50 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Steven Peri Seener. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Dahlia Damas; UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps; party text was omitted. (dnh)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction Fri 02/19 1:55 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Steven Peri Seener. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $4,000,000,000. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to $4,000,000. (dnh)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Civil Cover Sheet Fri 02/19 1:58 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Steven Peri Seener to RE-FILE Document No. 2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the form used for the civil cover sheet is not the S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet form dated October 1, 2020. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated October 1, 2020. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated October 1, 2020 is located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (dnh)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Fri 02/19 2:01 PM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lewis J. Liman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(dnh)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Fri 02/19 2:01 PM
Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (dnh)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Fri 02/19 2:02 PM
Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 18, 2021
3 3 service Request for Issuance of Summons Thu 02/18 9:02 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to THE United States Of America, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Dahlia Damas..(Seener, Steven)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Thu 02/18 9:00 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Seener, Steven)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 02/18 8:51 PM
COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-23996432)Document filed by Dahlia Damas..(Seener, Steven)
Related: [-]