New York Southern District Court
Case #: 1:21-cv-01466
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:Feb 18, 2021
Last checked: Saturday Feb 20, 2021 1:06 AM EST
ADR Provider
Unknown NYS Dept. of Labor employees, and 2/5/21 unknown Key Bank Rep.
Defendant
Keybank
Defendant
Kerri Loveland
Defendant
Roberta Reardon
Defendant
Unknown Rep of Key Bank Jay
Defendant
Unknown Supervisor Jay of Key Bank
Plaintiff
Reuben Avent
2363 Adam Clayton Powel Jr. Blvd Apt. 5J
New York, NY 10030


Docket last updated: 03/03/2021 11:59 PM EST
Monday, March 01, 2021
3 3 1 pgs order Order Granting IFP Application Mon 03/01 1:03 PM
ORDER GRANTING IFP APPLICATION: Leave to proceed in this Court without prepayment of fees is authorized. 28 U.S.C. 1915. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 3/1/2021) (vn)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 18, 2021
2 2 cmp Complaint Fri 02/19 9:38 AM
COMPLAINT against Keybank, Kerri Loveland, Roberta Reardon, Unknown NYS Dept. of Labor employees, and 2/5/21 unknown Key Bank Rep., Unknown Rep of Key Bank Jay, Unknown Supervisor Jay of Key Bank. Document filed by Reuben Avent..(rdz)
Related: [-]
1 1 misc Request to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Fri 02/19 9:37 AM
REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Reuben Avent..(rdz)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Fri 02/19 9:39 AM
Case Designated ECF. (rdz)
Related: [-]