New York Southern District Court
Judge:Ronnie Abrams
Case #: 1:21-mc-00199
CauseM 98 Miscellaneous Application to File Civil Case Under Seal
Case Filed:Feb 22, 2021
Terminated:Feb 26, 2021

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 03/03/2021 11:59 PM EST
Friday, February 26, 2021
3 3 3 pgs order Order on Motion to for Leave to File Case Under Seal Fri 02/26 1:42 PM
ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED ANONYMOUSLY granting1 Motion for Leave to File Case Under Seal. Cases sought to be filed under seal for which permission is granted must not be initiated electronically Please see Section 14.2 of the ECF Rules and Instructions.[LINK:ECF RULES & INSTRUCTIONS] . IT IS HEREBY: ORDERED that subject to modification by the assigned Judge, Plaintiff's motion to proceed anonymously by using the pseudonym reflected in the caption of this Order is GRANTED; ORDERED, that Plaintiffs' motion to proceed anonymously by using the pseudonyms for Defendants reflected in the caption of this Order and pseudonyms for other Department of Corrections and Community Supervision ("DOCCS") staff as described in the Complaint is GRANTED; ORDERED, that all public filings will proceed anonymously by using the pseudonyms reflected in this Order, and that all other filings will be under seal to the extent they reveal the identities of Plaintiff, officers alleged to have engaged in sexual abuse of or retaliation against Plaintiff, and other DOCCS staff as described in the Complaint (apart from the supervisory Defendants identified by name in the caption of this Order); and ORDERED, that Defendants and their legal counsel are prohibited from disclosing to a third party the names of Plaintiff or the officers alleged to have engaged in the sexual abuse of or retaliation against Plaintiff, or of the staff described in the Complaint (apart from the supervisory Defendants identified by name in the caption of this case) unless and until the assigned District Court Judge makes a contrary ruling on confidentiality. This Order does not prohibit Defendants from consulting their legal counsel concerning the allegations of the Complaint or the identities of Plaintiff or the corrections staff named therein. SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 2/24/2021) (jca)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 23, 2021
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification Tue 02/23 1:04 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney David Miller Stuart. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Jane Smith, Anthony J. Annucci, Captain A, Captain B, Michael Dye, Jason Effman, Grievance Supervisor A, Investigator A, Sabina Kaplan, Lieutenant A, Steven Maher, Christian Nunez, Officer A, Officer B, Officer C, Officer D, Sergeant A, Sergeant B, John Shipley, Elaine Velez.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps;. (bcu)
Related: [-]
notice Miscellaneous Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Tue 02/23 1:45 PM
MISCELLANEOUS CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Ronnie Abrams. This is a Part I Term Assignment matter..(bcu)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Court Regarding Motion for Leave to File Case Under Seal Tue 02/23 1:48 PM
***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE CASE UNDER SEAL. Document No. 1 MISCELLANEOUS CASE INITIATING DOCUMENT - MOTION for Leave to File Case Under Seal ("Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed Anonymously"). was reviewed and approved as to form. (bcu)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 22, 2021
2 2 misc Miscellaneous Cover Sheet Mon 02/22 11:34 PM
MISCELLANEOUS COVER SHEET filed..(Stuart, David)
Related: [-]
1 1 motion Leave to File Case Under Seal Mon 02/22 11:29 PM
***EX-PARTE*** MISCELLANEOUS CASE INITIATING DOCUMENT - MOTION for Leave to File Case Under Seal ("Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed Anonymously") .Document filed by JANE SMITH.(Stuart, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Miscellaneous Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed Anonymously,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Complaint [Sealed],
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Complaint [Redacted],
Att: 5 Exhibit E - Proposed Order