Suber v. Equifax Information Systems LLC
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Bruce Howe Hendricks |
Case #: | 6:14-cv-02522 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act |
Case Filed: | Jun 20, 2014 |
Terminated: | Oct 09, 2014 |
Last checked: Thursday Dec 18, 2014 6:32 AM EST |
Defendant
Equifax Information Systems LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Angela Suber
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/22/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, October 09, 2014 | ||
14 | 14 ORDER DISMISSING CASE without costs and without prejudice to the right of either party, upon good cause shown within sixty (60) days, to reinstate the action if settlement is not consummated. Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 10/9/14. (alew, ) | |
Wednesday, August 20, 2014 | ||
13 | 13 CONSENT AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 10/9/2014, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 3/23/2015, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 4/23/2015, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 6/8/2015, Discovery due by 6/5/2015, Motions due by 6/26/2015, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 7/13/2015, Jury Selection Deadline 8/10/2015, Mediation Due by 6/5/2015. All other deadlines as set out. Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 8/20/2014. (mbro, ) | |
Friday, August 15, 2014 | ||
12 | 12 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Angela Suber.(Maxfield, David) | |
11 | 11 Joint Rule 26(f) Report by Equifax Information Systems LLC, Angela Suber.(Maxfield, David) | |
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, July 23, 2014 | ||
10 | 10 TEXT ORDER granting 9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Erin Novak for the Plaintiff. Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 7/23/2014.(mbro, ) | |
Tuesday, July 22, 2014 | ||
9 | 9 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Erin A. Novak ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-5453879) by Angela Suber. Response to Motion due by 8/8/2014.No proposed order.(Maxfield, David) | |
Att: 1 Application for Pro Hac Admission, | ||
Att: 2 Certificate of Good Standing | ||
Friday, July 11, 2014 | ||
8 | 8 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 8/1/2014, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 8/15/2014, Rule 26 Report due by 8/15/2014, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 9/5/2014, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 10/6/2014, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 11/5/2014, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 11/5/2014, Discovery due by 1/5/2015, Motions due by 2/4/2015, Jury Selection Deadline 5/5/2015, Mediation Due by 1/5/2015. Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 7/11/2014. (mbro, ) | |
Wednesday, July 02, 2014 | ||
6 | 6 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Angela Suber.(Maxfield, David) | |
Monday, June 30, 2014 | ||
5 | 5 Case Reassigned to Judge Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks. Judge Honorable J Michelle Childs no longer assigned to the case. (suro, ) | |
Friday, June 27, 2014 | ||
4 | 4 ANSWER to Complaint by Equifax Information Systems LLC.(Ellis, Bernie) | |
Friday, June 20, 2014 | ||
3 | 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Equifax Information Systems LLC.(mbro) | |
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Laurens County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2014-CP 30-00324 (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0420-5401500), filed by Equifax Information Systems LLC.(mbro) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A- State Court Pleadings |