74 Pinehurst LLC. v. State of New York
Original Case: 1:19-cv-06447
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:21-cv-00467 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 950 Other Statutes - Constitutionality of State Statutes |
Case Filed: | Feb 26, 2021 |
Terminated: | Feb 06, 2023 |
Last checked: Tuesday Feb 07, 2023 3:30 AM EST |
Amicus Curiae
New York State Association of REALTORS, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
Hilary Botein
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
California Apartment Association
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
San Francisco Apartment Association
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
National Association of REALTORS
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
Cato Institute
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
Karen Chapple
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
Lance Freeman
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
Edward Goetz
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
Kimberley Johnson
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
Thomas Sugrue
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
Elvin Wyly
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
James DeFilippis
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
Sharon Zukin
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
German Tejeda, In his official capacity as a Member of the Rent Guidelines Board
|
|
Defendant
Sheila Garcia, In her official capacity as a Member of the Rent Guidelines Board
|
|
Defendant
Leah Goodridge, In her official capacity as a Member of the Rent Guidelines Board
|
|
Defendant
J. Scott Walsh, In his official capacity as a Member of the Rent Guidelines Board
|
|
Defendant
Patti Stone, In her official capacity as a Member of the Rent Guidelines Board
|
|
Defendant
May Yu, In her official capacity as a Member of the Rent Guidelines Board
|
|
Defendant
Alex Schwartz, In his official capacity as a Member of the Rent Guidelines Board
|
|
Defendant
Cecilia Joza, In her official capacity as a Member of the Rent Guidelines Board
|
|
Defendant
V Reiss, In his official capacity as Chair of the Rent Guidelines Board
|
|
Defendant
New York City Rent Guidelines Board
|
|
Defendant
City of New York
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
Cecilia Joza, In her official capacity as a Member of the Rent Guidelines Board
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Coalition for the Homeless
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Community Voices Heard
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
New York Tenants and Neighbors, (T&N)
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Sheila Garcia, In her official capacity as a Member of the Rent Guidelines Board
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
J. Scott Walsh, In his official capacity as a Member of the Rent Guidelines Board
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
State of New York
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
New York Division of Housing and Community Renewal
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
RuthAnne Visnauskas, Individually and in her official capacity as Commissioner of New York State Division of Housing and Community Renewal
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
City of New York
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
New York City Rent Guidelines Board
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
David Reiss, In his official capacity as Chair of the Rent Guidelines Board
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Alex Schwartz, In his official capacity as a Member of the Rent Guidelines Board
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
German Tejeda, In his official capacity as a Member of the Rent Guidelines Board
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
May Yu, In her official capacity as a Member of the Rent Guidelines Board
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Patti Stone, In her official capacity as a Member of the Rent Guidelines Board
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Leah Goodridge, In her official capacity as a Member of the Rent Guidelines Board
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
74 Pinehurst LLC.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Eighty Mulberry Realty Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Vasiliki Panagoulias
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Dimos Panagoulias
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Dino Panagoulias
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
177 Wadsworth LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
141 Wadsworth LLC
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Feb 06 2023
OPINION, affirming the judgment of the district court, by GC, BDP, SLC, FILED.[3464146] [21-467, 21-558] |
Docket last updated: 02/07/2023 3:29 AM EST |