Streamscale, Inc. v. Cloudera, Inc. et al
Texas Western District Court | |
Judge: | Alan D Albright |
Case #: | 6:21-cv-00198 |
Nature of Suit | 830 Property Rights - Patent |
Cause | 35:271 Patent Infringement |
Case Filed: | Mar 02, 2021 |
Terminated: | Nov 01, 2023 |
Last checked: Sunday Aug 29, 2021 4:18 AM CDT |
Defendant
Cloudera, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Wargaming (Austin), Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Experian PLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Intel Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Streamscale, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
ADP, Inc.
Terminated: 08/26/2021
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/23/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Thursday, January 25, 2024 | ||
380 | 380
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Thu 01/25 1:12 PM
ORDER GRANTING379 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jeffrey Lamken. Attorney added for Streamscale, Inc. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order, if he/she has not previously done so for a prior case in this District . Registration is managed by the PACER Service Center. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (bot2) |
|
Wednesday, January 24, 2024 | ||
379 | 379
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 01/24 3:46 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jeffrey Lamken ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number BTXWDC-18340603) by on behalf of Streamscale, Inc.. (Lamken, Jeffrey) |