The Arc Maryland v. Talbot County
Maryland District Court | |
Judge: | George Levi Russell, III |
Case #: | 1:21-cv-00593 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | 42:12132 Americans with Disabilities Act - Discrimination |
Case Filed: | Mar 08, 2021 |
Terminated: | Mar 16, 2021 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 04, 2021 5:42 AM EDT |
Plaintiff
The Arc Maryland
8601 Robert Fulton Drive, Suite 140
Columbia, MD 21046 |
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Carroll County
Terminated: 03/15/2021
225 North Center Street, #308
Westminster, MD 21157 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Garrett County
Terminated: 03/12/2021
203 South Fork Street - Room 207
Oakland, MD 21550 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mayor and City Council of Baltimore City
Terminated: 03/12/2021
City Hall - Room 250 100 North Holiday Street
Baltimore, MD 21202 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Queen Anne's County
Terminated: 03/12/2021
107 N. Liberty Street
Centreville, MD 21617 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Somerset County
Terminated: 03/12/2021
County Office Complex 11916 Somerset Ave.
Princess Anne, MD 21853 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Talbot County
Terminated: 03/16/2021
Talbot County Courthouse 11 North Washington Street
Easton, MD 21601 |
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Tuesday, March 16, 2021 | ||
23 | 23
2
pgs
order
Order
Tue 03/16 12:55 PM
MARGINAL ORDER approving22 Plaintiff's Notice of Dismissal of Complaint as to Defendant Talbot County; directing the Clerk to terminate Talbot County as Defendant in this action; directing the Clerk to close this case. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 3/16/2021. (ols, Deputy Clerk) |
|
22 | 22
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Tue 03/16 11:51 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by The Arc Maryland (Shea, Casey) |
|
Monday, March 15, 2021 | ||
21 | 21
2
pgs
order
Order
Mon 03/15 2:56 PM
MARGINAL ORDER approving20 Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to Defendant Carroll County; directing the Clerk to terminate Carroll County as a Defendant in this action. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 3/15/2021. (ols, Deputy Clerk) |
|
20 | 20
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Mon 03/15 2:02 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by The Arc Maryland (Shea, Casey) |
|
19 | 19
order
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Mon 03/15 10:05 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Shira Wakschlag. Directing attorney Shira Wakschlag to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 3/15/2021. (srds, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Friday, March 12, 2021 | ||
18 | 18
2
pgs
order
Order
Fri 03/12 3:59 PM
MARGINAL ORDER approving16 Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Complaint as to Defendant Somerset County filed by The Arc Maryland; directing the Clerk to terminate Somerset County as a Defendant in this action. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 3/12/2021. (ols, Deputy Clerk) |
|
17 | 17
2
pgs
order
Order
Fri 03/12 3:58 PM
MARGINAL ORDER approving15 Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Complaint as to Defendant Queen Anne's County filed by The Arc Maryland; directing the Clerk to terminate Queen Anne's County as a defendant in this action. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 3/12/2021. (ols, Deputy Clerk) |
|
16 | 16
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Fri 03/12 3:47 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by The Arc Maryland (Shea, Casey) |
|
15 | 15
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Fri 03/12 3:42 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by The Arc Maryland (Shea, Casey) |
|
14 | 14
2
pgs
order
Order
Fri 03/12 10:12 AM
MARGINAL ORDER approving12 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to Defendant Garrett County filed by The Arc Maryland; directing the Clerk to terminate Garrett County as a Defendant in this action. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 3/12/2021. (ols, Deputy Clerk) |
|
13 | 13
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Voluntary Dismissal
Fri 03/12 10:11 AM
MARGINAL ORDER approving11 Plaintiff's Notice of Dismissal of Complaint as to Defendant Mayor and City Council of Baltimore; denying as moot10 Plaintiff's Motion for Voluntary Dismissal of Baltimore City; directing the Clerk to terminate Baltimore City as a Defendant in this action. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 3/12/2021. (ols, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Thursday, March 11, 2021 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Thu 03/11 7:48 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by The Arc Maryland (Shea, Casey) |
|
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Thu 03/11 7:12 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by The Arc Maryland (Shea, Casey) |
|
10 | 10
motion
Voluntary Dismissal
Thu 03/11 7:04 PM
MOTION for Voluntary Dismissal by The Arc Maryland(Shea, Casey) |
|
Tuesday, March 09, 2021 | ||
9 | 9
notice
QC Notice - Miscellaneous
Tue 03/09 11:40 AM
QC NOTICE: 7 Notice of Appearance filed by Mayor and City Council of Baltimore City was filed incorrectly. **Each attorney must file their Notice of Appearance using their CM/ECF login in order to be added as counsel to a case. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (ols, Deputy Clerk) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 03/09 11:36 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel W Goldberg on behalf of Mayor and City Council of Baltimore City (Goldberg, Daniel) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement
Tue 03/09 10:16 AM
Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by The Arc Maryland (Shea, Casey) |
|
5 | 5
notice
QC Notice - Miscellaneous
Tue 03/09 9:57 AM
QC NOTICE:1 Complaint,,, filed by The Arc Maryland was filed incorrectly. **Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Form should not be filed as an attachment to the Complaint. Please refile using the correct event found under Other Filings > Other Documents > Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement. The attachment has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (ols, Deputy Clerk) |
|
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Tue 03/09 9:56 AM
Summons Issued 21 days as to Carroll County, Garrett County, Mayor and City Council of Baltimore City, Queen Anne's County, Somerset County, Talbot County. (ols, Deputy Clerk) |
|
3 | 3
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Tue 03/09 12:14 AM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Shira Wakschlag (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-9147543.) by The Arc Maryland(Shea, Casey) |
|
Monday, March 08, 2021 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Temporary Restraining Order
Tue 03/09 12:00 AM
MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by The Arc Maryland(Shea, Casey) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support Memorandum in Support of the Motion for TRO and PI, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Plaintiff's Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Plaintiff's Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit Plaintiff's Exhibit 3, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit Plaintiff's Exhibit 4, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit Plaintiff's Exhibit 5, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit Plaintiff's Exhibit 6, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit Plaintiff's Exhibit 7, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit Plaintiff's Exhibit 8, | ||
Att: 11 Summons Summons - Baltimore County, | ||
Att: 12 Summons Summons - Carroll County, | ||
Att: 13 Summons Summons - Garrett County, | ||
Att: 14 Summons Summons - Queen Anne's County, | ||
Att: 15 Summons Summons - Somerset County, | ||
Att: 16 Summons Summons - Talbot County | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 03/08 11:35 PM
COMPLAINT The Arc Maryland against Carroll County, Garrett County, Mayor and City Council of Baltimore City, Queen Anne's County, Somerset County, Talbot County ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0416-9147503.), filed by The Arc Maryland.(Shea, Casey) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Plaintiff's Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Plaintiff's Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Plaintiff's Exhibit 3, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Plaintiff's Exhibit 4, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit Plaintiff's Exhibit 5, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit Plaintiff's Exhibit 6, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit Plaintiff's Exhibit 7, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit Plaintiff's Exhibit 8, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit Plaintiff's Exhibit 9, | ||
Att: 10 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 11 Summons Summons - Baltimore City, | ||
Att: 12 Summons Summons - Carroll County, | ||
Att: 13 Summons Summons - Garrett County, | ||
Att: 14 Summons Summons - Queen Anne's County, | ||
Att: 15 Summons Summons - Somerset County, | ||
Att: 16 Summons Summons - Talbot County, | ||
Att: 17 Disclosure Form |