Kristin Lingren v. Medtronic Inc et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Stephen V Wilson |
Referred: | Frederick F Mumm |
Case #: | 2:14-cv-04857 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Jun 23, 2014 |
Terminated: | Aug 08, 2014 |
Last checked: Saturday May 09, 2015 3:30 PM PDT |
Defendant
Does
|
|
Defendant
Medtronic Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Medtronic Sofamor Danek USA Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Medtronic Vertelink Inc
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kristin Lingren
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Tuesday, August 19, 2014 | ||
25 | 25 RECEIVED Notice of Receipt of Electronic Case transferred from California Central; case has been opened in District of Oregon as case 1:14-cv-01325 (mg) | |
Friday, August 08, 2014 | ||
24 | 24 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER Defendants Motion to Transfer Venue14 Defendants Motion to Dismiss9 . by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: For the above reasons, the Court GRANTS Defendants Motion to Transfer Venue, and this action is hereby transferred to the United States District Court for the District of Oregon. MD JS-6. Case Terminated. (pj) | |
Att: 1 Letter CV 22 Transfer Out | ||
23 | 23 IN CHAMBERS ORDER-TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Judge Stephen V. Wilson re: MOTION to Dismiss Case9 , and MOTION to Transfer Case to District of Oregon14 : The Motions are suitable to a determination without oral argument. Fed. R. Civ. P. 78(b); Local Rule 7-15. The hearing scheduled for 08/11/2014 is VACATED and OFF-CALENDAR. Order to issue THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pc) TEXT ONLY ENTRY | |
22 | 22 SUPPLEMENT to MOTION to Dismiss Case 9 Second Notice of Supplemental Authority Regarding Their Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed by Defendants Medtronic Inc, Medtronic Sofamor Danek USA Inc, Medtronic Vertelink Inc.(Brown, Michael) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
Tuesday, July 29, 2014 | ||
21 | 21 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority Regarding Their Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint [Doc. No. 9] filed by Defendants Medtronic Inc, Medtronic Sofamor Danek USA Inc, Medtronic Vertelink Inc.(Brown, Michael) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 [Scanlon] | ||
Sunday, July 27, 2014 | ||
20 | 20 REPLY in Support of MOTION to Transfer Case to District of Oregon 14 filed by Defendants Medtronic Inc, Medtronic Sofamor Danek USA Inc, Medtronic Vertelink Inc. (Brown, Michael) | |
19 | 19 REPLY in Support of MOTION to Dismiss Case 9 filed by Defendants Medtronic Inc, Medtronic Sofamor Danek USA Inc, Medtronic Vertelink Inc. (Brown, Michael) | |
Thursday, July 17, 2014 | ||
18 | 18 PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE Opposition re: MOTION to Transfer Case to District of Oregon 14 filed by Plaintiff Kristin Lingren. (Finson, Lowell) | |
17 | 17 Opposition re: MOTION to Dismiss Case 9 filed by Plaintiff Kristin Lingren.(Finson, Lowell) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration | ||
Friday, July 11, 2014 | ||
16 | 16 NEW CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc) | |
Tuesday, July 01, 2014 | ||
15 | 15 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 14-03 -Related Case- filed. Related Case No: CV 14-01595 SVW(FFMx). Case transferred from Judge Manuel L. Real and Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Wistrich to Judge Stephen V. Wilson and Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge CV 14-04857 SVW(FFMx). Signed by Judge Stephen V. Wilson (rn) | |
Friday, June 27, 2014 | ||
14 | 14 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to District of Oregon filed by Defendants Medtronic Inc, Medtronic Sofamor Danek USA Inc, Medtronic Vertelink Inc. Motion set for hearing on 8/11/2014 at 01:30 PM before Judge Manuel L. Real.(Brown, Michael) | |
Att: 1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration of Michael K. Brown, | ||
Att: 3 Declaration of Anne Ziebell, | ||
Att: 4 Declaration of Jerri Province, | ||
Att: 5 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Transfer Venue | ||
13 | 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendants Medtronic Inc, Medtronic Sofamor Danek USA Inc, Medtronic Vertelink Inc identifying Medtronic, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Brown, Michael) | |
12 | 12 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Medtronic Inc, Medtronic Sofamor Danek USA Inc, Medtronic Vertelink Inc, identifying Medtronic, Inc.; Medtronic Sofamor Danek USA, Inc.; Medtronic Vertelink, Inc.. (Brown, Michael) | |
11 | 11 DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by Defendants Medtronic Inc, Medtronic Sofamor Danek USA Inc, Medtronic Vertelink Inc.. (Brown, Michael) | |
10 | 10 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re MOTION to Dismiss Case 9 filed by Defendants Medtronic Inc, Medtronic Sofamor Danek USA Inc, Medtronic Vertelink Inc.(Brown, Michael) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit F, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit G, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit H, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit I, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit J | ||
9 | 9 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendants Medtronic Inc, Medtronic Sofamor Danek USA Inc, Medtronic Vertelink Inc. Motion set for hearing on 8/11/2014 at 01:30 PM before Judge Manuel L. Real.(Attorney Michael Kevin Brown added to party Medtronic Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Michael Kevin Brown added to party Medtronic Sofamor Danek USA Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Michael Kevin Brown added to party Medtronic Vertelink Inc(pty:dft))(Brown, Michael) | |
Att: 1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Dismiss | ||
8 | 8 ORDER RE: NOTICE TO COUNSEL upon filing of the complaint by Judge Manuel L. Real. READ CAREFULLY - FAILURE TO COMPLY MAY LEAD TO SANCTIONS. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (cch) | |
7 | 7 Pursuant to Local Rule 3-2, the following PDF documents were received on 6/26/14, and attached to the Court's docket on 6/27/14: initiating documents. (mg) | |
Thursday, June 26, 2014 | ||
6 | 6 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendants Medtronic Inc, Medtronic Sofamor Danek USA Inc, Medtronic Vertelink Inc. Related Case(s): 2:14-cv-01595-SVW(Brown, Michael) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Heather Order | ||
5 | 5 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiff Kristin Lingren. Related Case(s): 2:14-cv-01595-SVW (Finson, Lowell) | |
4 | 4 CLERKS E-MAIL RE LOCAL RULE 3-2 TO COUNSEL on 6/26/14 addressed to lowell@justiceforyou.com. COURT REQUIRES YOUR IMMEDIATE RESPONSE. Pursuant to Local Rule 3-2, you are required to e-mail, within 24 hours of filing, a Filed stamped copy of your complaint and other civil case initiating documents, in PDF format to the Court. To date, we have not received the PDF images of your filing. Please do so within 24 hours or this matter will be referred to the Judge for further proceedings. (mg) | |
Monday, June 23, 2014 | ||
3 | 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Manuel L. Real and Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Wistrich. (et) | |
2 | 2 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Kristin Lingren. (et) (mg). | |
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against Defendants Medtronic Inc, Medtronic Sofamor Danek USA Inc, Medtronic Vertelink Inc, Does 1-50, Inclusive. Case assigned to Judge Manuel L. Real for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Andrew J Wistrich.(Filing fee $ 400 PAID.) Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiff Kristin Lingren. [Summons not Issued on 6/23/2014.] (et) (mg). | |
Att: 1 (6/27/2014) Civil Cover Sheet |