Allen Video Technology, Inc. v. Epson America, Inc. et al
Maryland District Court | |
Judge: | Roger W Titus |
Case #: | 1:14-cv-02079 |
Nature of Suit | 830 Property Rights - Patent |
Cause | 15:1126 Patent Infringement |
Case Filed: | Jun 27, 2014 |
Terminated: | Oct 28, 2014 |
Last checked: Monday Jan 19, 2015 11:10 AM EST |
Defendant
Epson America, Inc.
3840 Kilroy Airport Way
Long Beach, CA 90806 |
|
Defendant
SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION
|
|
Defendant
Seiko Epson Corporation
|
|
Plaintiff
ALLEN VIDEO TECHNOLOGY, INC.
308 Edgevale Road
Baltimore, MD 21210 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Allen Video Technology, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Tuesday, October 28, 2014 | ||
10 | 10 MARGINAL ORDER approving9 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal with prejudice. Signed by Judge Roger W Titus on 10/28/2014. (aos, Deputy Clerk) | |
Friday, October 24, 2014 | ||
9 | 9 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Allen Video Technology, Inc. (Lewis, Joseph) | |
Wednesday, October 22, 2014 | ||
8 | 8 (FILED IN ERROR- REFILED AT ECF9 )NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Allen Video Technology, Inc. (Lewis, Joseph) Modified on 10/28/2014 (aos, Deputy Clerk). | |
Friday, August 01, 2014 | ||
Set/Reset Deadlines: Epson America, Inc. answer due 10/27/2014; Seiko Epson Corporation answer due 10/27/2014. (aos, Deputy Clerk) | ||
Tuesday, July 29, 2014 | ||
7 | 7 MARGINAL ORDER granting6 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint. Answer due 10/27/2014. Signed by Judge Roger W Titus on 7/28/2014. (aos, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 8/1/2014 (aos, Deputy Clerk). | |
Wednesday, July 23, 2014 | ||
6 | 6 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, by Allen Video Technology, Inc. Responses due by 8/11/2014 (Lewis, Joseph) | |
Thursday, July 10, 2014 | ||
5 | 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Allen Video Technology, Inc.. Epson America, Inc. served on 7/7/2014, answer due 7/28/2014.(Lewis, Joseph) | |
Att: 1 Receipt | ||
Thursday, July 03, 2014 | ||
4 | 4 Summons Issued 21 days as to Epson America, Inc., Seiko Epson Corporation.(aos, Deputy Clerk) | |
Att: 1 Summons | ||
Monday, June 30, 2014 | ||
Case Reassigned to Judge Roger W Titus. Judge Richard D Bennett no longer assigned to the case. (pkfs, Deputy Clerk) | ||
Friday, June 27, 2014 | ||
3 | 3 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by ALLEN VIDEO TECHNOLOGY, INC.. (Lewis, Joseph) | |
2 | 2 Report on Filing Patent/Trademark. (Lewis, Joseph) | |
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-4827830.), filed by ALLEN VIDEO TECHNOLOGY, INC..(Lewis, Joseph) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 5 Summons for Epson America, | ||
Att: 6 Summons for Seiko Epson Corporation |