Kirkland-Hudson v. Mount Vernon City School District et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Kenneth M Karas |
Referred: | Andrew E Krause |
Case #: | 7:21-cv-00695 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 42:2000e-2ot Job Discrimination (other) |
Case Filed: | Jan 26, 2021 |
Last checked: Sunday Jul 25, 2021 5:45 AM EDT |
Defendant
Susan Burnett
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Rachel DePaul
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Felicia Gaon
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mount Vernon City School District
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Karalyne Sperling
|
|
Plaintiff
Josephine Kirkland-Hudson
116 Sherman Avenue
White Plains, NY 10607 |
Docket last updated: 03/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, March 19, 2024 | ||
119 | 119
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Tue 03/19 2:28 PM
ORDER granting118 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re118 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to114 Counter Statement to Rule 56.1,116 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Deanna L. Collins dated 03/19/2024.,109 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Notice of motion) . Granted. So Ordered. ( Replies due by 4/8/2024.) (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 3/19/24) (yv) |
|
118 | 118
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Tue 03/19 10:24 AM
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to114 Counter Statement to Rule 56.1,116 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Deanna L. Collins dated 03/19/2024. Document filed by Susan Burnett, Rachel DePaul, Felicia Gaon, Kenneth R. Hamilton, Mount Vernon City School District, Mount Vernon City School District/ Board of Education, Karalyne Sperling, Marcie E. Tiggs..(Collins, Deanna) |