Triggs v. Oklahoma State of et al
Oklahoma Western District Court | |
Judge: | Robin J Cauthron |
Case #: | 5:14-cv-00688 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination |
Case Filed: | Jul 01, 2014 |
Terminated: | Feb 13, 2015 |
Last checked: Monday May 11, 2015 5:14 AM CDT |
Counter Claimant
Does
|
Represented By
|
Counter Claimant
Oklahoma State of
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
Demetra Triggs
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Does
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Oklahoma State of
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Demetra Triggs
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Friday, February 13, 2015 | ||
21 | 21
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Fri 02/13 1:45 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal Jointly by the Plaintiff and by All Defendants. (Maisch, Donald) |
|
20 | 20
answer
Answer to Amended Complaint Counterclaim
Fri 02/13 9:57 AM
FIRST ANSWER to17 Amended Complaint , FIRST COUNTERCLAIM and Affirmative Defenses against All Plaintiffs by All Defendants.(Maisch, Donald) |
|
Wednesday, February 11, 2015 | ||
19 | 19
order
Order on Motion for Leave to
Wed 02/11 7:16 AM
ORDER granting18 Motion for Leave for Defendant, State of Oklahoma (Oklahoma State Health Department) to file Answer, Affirmative Defenses, and Counterclaim to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint. Signed by Honorable Robin J. Cauthron on 2/11/15. (lg) |
|
Monday, February 02, 2015 | ||
18 | 18
motion
Leave
Mon 02/02 11:59 AM
UNOPPOSED MOTION for Leave to file Answer, Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaim to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by All Defendants. (Maisch, Donald) |
|
Friday, January 30, 2015 | ||
17 | 17
cmp
Amended Complaint
Fri 01/30 4:50 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT First Amended Complaint against Demetra Triggs filed by Demetra Triggs.(Oler, Curtis) |
|
Wednesday, January 28, 2015 | ||
16 | 16
order
Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Order on Motion for Order
Wed 01/28 11:19 AM
ORDER granting14 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint; terminating15 Motion for Order (actual doc is a proposed order). Signed by Honorable Robin J. Cauthron on 1/28/15. (lg) |
|
Friday, January 23, 2015 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Order
Fri 01/23 6:04 PM
MOTION for Order to file first amended complaint by Demetra Triggs. (Oler, Curtis) |
|
14 | 14
motion
Amend/Correct
Fri 01/23 6:02 PM
MOTION to Amend/Correct1 Complaint by Demetra Triggs. (Oler, Curtis) |
|
Friday, January 09, 2015 | ||
13 | 13 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 7/1/2015. Jury Trial set for 9/8/2015 09:00 AM before Honorable Robin J. Cauthron. Motions due by 7/1/2015.. Signed by deputy clerk on 1/9/15. (lg) | |
Tuesday, January 06, 2015 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Entry of Appearance
Tue 01/06 9:06 PM
ENTRY of Appearance by Charles L Henry, III on behalf of Demetra Triggs (Henry, Charles) |
|
Wednesday, December 31, 2014 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan
Wed 12/31 2:07 PM
JOINT STATUS REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN by Counter Claimant Oklahoma State of, Defendant Oklahoma State of. (Maisch, Donald) |
|
Thursday, December 18, 2014 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Docket
Thu 12/18 3:18 PM
STATUS/SCHEDULING CONFERENCE DOCKET (lg) |
|
Thursday, October 30, 2014 | ||
9 | 9 ANSWER to6 Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer, Counterclaim Reply to Counterclaim by Demetra Triggs.(Oler, Curtis) | |
Friday, October 24, 2014 | ||
8 | 8 ENTRY of Appearance by Robert H Noll, Jr on behalf of All Defendants (Noll, Robert) | |
7 | 7 ENTRY of Appearance by Donald D Maisch on behalf of All Defendants (Maisch, Donald) | |
6 | 6 FIRST ANSWER to Complaint , Affirmative Defenses and , COUNTERCLAIM against Demetra Triggs by All Defendants.(Maisch, Donald) | |
Wednesday, September 10, 2014 | ||
5 | 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Curtis G Oler on behalf of Demetra Triggs (Oler, Curtis) | |
Thursday, August 21, 2014 | ||
4 | 4 ORDER granting3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - Curtis G. Oler. Signed by Honorable Robin J. Cauthron on 8/21/14. (lg) | |
Friday, August 15, 2014 | ||
3 | 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 1087-1913201 by Demetra Triggs.(Henry, Charles) | |
Att: 1 Attachment Request for Admission | ||
Monday, July 07, 2014 | ||
PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-1890447. (Henry, Charles) | ||
Wednesday, July 02, 2014 | ||
2 | 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to Oklahoma State of. (cpp) | |
Tuesday, July 01, 2014 | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Demetra Triggs.(cpp) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Charge of Discrimination, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet |