No More Freeways et al v. United States Department of Transportation et al
Oregon District Court | |
Judge: | Youlee Yim You |
Case #: | 3:21-cv-00498 |
Nature of Suit | 893 Other Statutes - Environmental Matters |
Cause | 42:4321 Review of Agency Action-Environment |
Case Filed: | Apr 02, 2021 |
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 29, 2021 2:28 AM PDT |
Defendant
Thomas D. Everett
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
United States Department of Transportation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
United States Federal Highway Administration
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor Defendant
Oregon Department of Transportation
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Eliot Neighborhood Association
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Neighbors for Clean Air
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
No More Freeways
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Wednesday, March 16, 2022 | ||
26 | 26
notice
Voluntary Dismissal of Case
Wed 03/16 6:32 PM
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice . Filed by No More Freeways. (Anuta, Karl) |
|
Friday, March 04, 2022 | ||
order
1 - Scheduling
Fri 03/04 10:50 AM
ORDER : Joint Motion for Stay of All Deadlines23 is granted as follows: The dates set forth in docket entry 22 are stayed until either: (a) the parties settle this case and file a joint stipulation of dismissal; or (b) defendants file and the Court resolves defendants' Motion to Dismiss. If, within thirty days of this order, (a) the parties have not filed a joint stipulation of dismissal or (b) defendants have not filed a Motion to Dismiss, the parties shall file a joint status report updating the Court as to the status of the litigation and/or negotiations. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh) |
||
Thursday, March 03, 2022 | ||
23 | 23
motion
Stay
Thu 03/03 2:41 PM
Joint Motion for Stay of All Deadlines . Filed by Thomas D. Everett, United States Department of Transportation, United States Federal Highway Administration. (Rand, Matthew) (Main Document 23 replaced on 3/3/2022) (cw) |
|
order
Correction of the Record
Thu 03/03 4:29 PM
Notice of Correction by Clerk regarding23 Motion for Stay. A Clerical error has been discovered in the case record: The certificate of service is not dated. The following corrections were made to the record: A corrected PDF has been uploaded and has replaced the incorrect attachment.The Notice of Electronic Filing will be regenerated to all parties. (cw) |
||
Friday, December 03, 2021 | ||
22 | 22
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Fri 12/03 8:21 AM
ORDER : Joint Motion for Extension of Time21 is granted. Plaintiffs shall raise any concerns with the record to Defendants via letter or email by April 20, 2022. The deadline for the parties to attempt to resolve disputes relating to the record is May 2, 2022. Defendants shall file the administrative record with the Court by May 6, 2022. Regarding motions related to the administrative record: Plaintiffs shall file any motions related to the administrative record by May 9, 2022. Defendants' opposition is due May 23, 2022. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh) |
|
Thursday, December 02, 2021 | ||
21 | 21
motion
Extension of Time
Thu 12/02 6:39 PM
Joint Motion for Extension of Time . Filed by All Defendants. (Rand, Matthew) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A Declaration of Megan Channell | ||
Wednesday, July 28, 2021 | ||
20 | 20
limited
Consent to Jurisdiction by Magistrate Judge - by Party
Wed 07/28 10:52 AM
|
|
Tuesday, July 20, 2021 | ||
19 | 19
minute
Rule 16 Conference
Tue 07/20 10:49 AM
MINUTES of Proceedings : Telephonic Rule 16 Conference held on July 20, 2021. Regarding the administrative record: Defendants shall provide Plaintiffs with the administrative record by December 6, 2021. Plaintiffs shall raise any concerns with the record to Defendants via letter or email by January 20, 2022. The deadline for the parties to attempt to resolve disputes relating to the record is January 31, 2022. Defendants shall file the administrative record with the Court by February 7, 2022. Regarding motions related to the administrative record: Plaintiffs shall file any motions related to the administrative record by February 8, 2022. Defendants' opposition is due February 22, 2022. A revised record (if any) shall be filed with the Court by two weeks after the Court enters its order resolving any disputes. Regarding dispositive motions: Plaintiffs' cross-motion for summary judgment shall be filed within 60 days after the final administrative record is filed with the Court. Defendants' cross-motions for summary judgment and opposition to Plaintiffs' cross-motion is due 60 days after Plaintiffs file their motion. Plaintiffs' opposition to Defendants' cross-motions and reply in support of their motion is due 30 days after Defendants file their motion. Defendants' reply in support of their cross-motions is due 30 days after Plaintiffs file their opposition. Plaintiffs' my file a sur-reply 14 days thereafter. Each party shall adhere to the page limits for briefing unless a motion for leave to file an oversized brief is granted by the court in advance of the filing deadline. The joint ADR report is waived. The parties may file consents to magistrate judge jurisdiction at any time. For information regarding the role of magistrate judges and consenting to magistrate jurisdiction, see https://ord.uscourts.gov/consent . Any discovery matters will be handled on an informal basis. Unless otherwise ordered, in the event a discovery motion is filed, no written response to the motion will be required. Judge You does not require a paper judge's copy pursuant to LR 5-9 for filings that are submitted to her for consideration. Karl Anuta, Sean Malone, and Mike Sargetakis present as counsel for plaintiffs. Matthew Rand and Brent Allen present as counsel for defendants. Deanna Chang present as counsel for Intervenor Defendant Oregon Department of Transportation. Court Reporter: None. Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You presiding. (pvh) Modified on 7/20/2021 (pvh) |
|
Monday, July 19, 2021 | ||
18 | 18
oth_doc
Status Report
Mon 07/19 5:14 PM
Status Report Setting Forth All Defendants' Proposed Schedule by Oregon Department of Transportation, Thomas D. Everett, United States Department of Transportation, United States Federal Highway Administration. Filed by Oregon Department of Transportation, Thomas D. Everett, United States Department of Transportation, United States Federal Highway Administration. (Rand, Matthew) |
|
17 | 17
service
Affidavit of Service
Mon 07/19 4:49 PM
Affidavit of Service upon Thomas D. Everett served on 4/21/2021 Filed by Neighbors for Clean Air; No More Freeways; Eliot Neighborhood Association. (Malone, Sean) |
|
16 | 16
service
Affidavit of Service
Mon 07/19 4:48 PM
Affidavit of Service upon United States Federal Highway Administration served on 4/21/2021 Filed by Neighbors for Clean Air; No More Freeways; Eliot Neighborhood Association. (Malone, Sean) |
|
15 | 15
service
Affidavit of Service
Mon 07/19 4:46 PM
Affidavit of Service upon United States Department of Transportation served on 5/18/2021 Filed by Neighbors for Clean Air; No More Freeways; Eliot Neighborhood Association. (Malone, Sean) |
|
Tuesday, July 13, 2021 | ||
14 | 14
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 07/13 9:58 AM
Answer to1 Complaint,, . Filed by Oregon Department of Transportation. (Chang, Deanna) |
|
13 | 13
order
Order on Motion to Intervene
Tue 07/13 9:28 AM
ORDER: GRANTING Oregon Department of Transportation's Motion to Intervene as an Intervenor Defendant11 . Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pjg) |
|
Monday, July 12, 2021 | ||
12 | 12
oth_sup
Declaration
Mon 07/12 4:41 PM
Declaration of Megan Channell . Filed by Oregon Department of Transportation. (Chang, Deanna) |
|
11 | 11
motion
Intervene
Mon 07/12 4:39 PM
Motion to Intervene . Filed by Oregon Department of Transportation. (Chang, Deanna) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Proposed Answer ODOT | ||
Wednesday, June 16, 2021 | ||
10 | 10
order
1 - Scheduling
Wed 06/16 2:04 PM
Scheduling Order : SETTING a Telephonic Rule 16 Conference for Tuesday, July 20, 2021, at 09:30AM before Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. Local Rules 16-2 and 26-1 require that counsel confer prior to the conference. At the conference, counsel should be prepared to discuss the status of the case, relevant dates and deadlines, and any other significant issues. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh) |
|
Monday, June 14, 2021 | ||
9 | 9
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 06/14 2:15 PM
Answer to1 Complaint,, . Filed by Thomas D. Everett, United States Department of Transportation, United States Federal Highway Administration. (Rand, Matthew) |
|
Tuesday, May 04, 2021 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Attorney Appearance
Tue 05/04 9:33 AM
Notice of Appearance of Matthew Philip Rand appearing on behalf of All Defendants Filed by on behalf of All Defendants. (Rand, Matthew) |
|
Tuesday, April 06, 2021 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued
Tue 04/06 9:15 AM
Summons Issued Electronically as to Thomas D. Everett, United States Department of Transportation, United States Federal Highway Administration. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (sb) |
|
Monday, April 05, 2021 | ||
6 | 6
service
Proposed Summons
Mon 04/05 3:56 PM
Amended Proposed Summons For Thomas D. Everett, Administrator for United States Federal Highway Administration Filed by Eliot Neighborhood Association, Neighbors for Clean Air, No More Freeways. (Malone, Sean) |
|
5 | 5
service
Proposed Summons
Mon 04/05 3:54 PM
Amended Proposed Summons for United States Federal Highway Administration Filed by Eliot Neighborhood Association, Neighbors for Clean Air, No More Freeways. (Malone, Sean) |
|
4 | 4
service
Proposed Summons
Mon 04/05 3:53 PM
Amended Proposed Summons for United States Department of Transportation Filed by Eliot Neighborhood Association, Neighbors for Clean Air, No More Freeways. (Malone, Sean) |
|
Friday, April 02, 2021 | ||
3 | 3
order
3 - Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order - FORM EVENT
Fri 04/02 5:32 PM
Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5 . Discovery is to be completed by 8/2/2021. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 8/30/2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (sb) |
|
2 | 2
oth_doc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Fri 04/02 3:45 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Eliot Neighborhood Association, Neighbors for Clean Air, No More Freeways. (Malone, Sean) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 04/02 3:42 PM
Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $402 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8023382 Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by Neighbors for Clean Air, Eliot Neighborhood Association, No More Freeways against Federal Highway Administration, Thomas D. Everett, United States Department of Transportation. (Malone, Sean) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Summons U.S. Department of Transportation, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Summons Federal Highway Administration, | ||
Att: 4 Proposed Summons Thomas D. Everett, Administrator |