Summit Family Restaurants Inc.
Arizona Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Brenda K Martin |
Case #: | 2:21-bk-02477 |
Case Filed: | Apr 06, 2021 |
Creditor Meeting: | May 11, 2021 |
Terminated: | Jun 23, 2021 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Summit Family Restaurants Inc.
2501 N Hayden Rd Ste 103
Scottsdale, AZ 85257-2326 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
U.S. TRUSTEE
OFFICE OF THE U.S. TRUSTEE 230 NORTH FIRST AVENUE SUITE 204
PHOENIX, AZ 85003 |
1. | Casa Bonita files for Chapter 11 bankruptcy (thedenverchannel.com) |
Submitted Mon 04/12/2021 | |
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Thursday, August 26, 2021 | ||
76 | 76
vCal
Virtual Minute Entry
Thu 08/26 9:40 AM
Minutes of Hearing held on: 08/31/2021 Subject: CONTINUED CHAPTER 11 STATUS CONFERENCE Appearances: NONE Proceedings: VACATED: CASE TRANSFERRED TO COLORADO. (vCal Hearing ID (1554069)). (JAL) |