Louisiana Middle District Court
Judge:Susie Morgan
Referred: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Case #: 3:21-cv-00198
Nature of Suit448 Civil Rights - Education
Cause18:1962 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Case Filed:Apr 08, 2021
Last checked: Tuesday Oct 05, 2021 3:29 AM CDT
Defendant
Mary Leach Werner
Represented By
Shelton Dennis Blunt
Phelps Dunbar, LLP
contact info
Molly C McDiarmid
Phelps Dunbar LLP
contact info
Susan W. Furr
Phelps Dunbar LLP
contact info
Michael B. Victorian
Phelps Dunbar, LLP
contact info
Karleen Joseph Green
Phelps Dunbar - B.R.
contact info
Defendant
James Williams
Represented By
Susan W. Furr
Phelps Dunbar LLP
contact info
Defendant
Scott Woodward
Represented By
Magdalen Blessey Bickford
Mcglinchey Stafford
contact info
Rodolfo Jesus Aguilar, Jr.
Mcglinchey Stafford PLLC
contact info
Camille Rachelle Bryant
Mcglinchey Stafford PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Joseph Alleva
Defendant
Board of Supervisors of Louisiana State University and Agricultural and Mechanical College
Represented By
Shelton Dennis Blunt
Phelps Dunbar, LLP
contact info
Molly C McDiarmid
Phelps Dunbar LLP
contact info
Susan W. Furr
Phelps Dunbar LLP
contact info
Michael B. Victorian
Phelps Dunbar, LLP
contact info
Karleen Joseph Green
Phelps Dunbar - B.R.
contact info
Defendant
William Jenkins
Represented By
Robin Anne Sylvester
Sylvester Law Firm
contact info
Defendant
Louisiana State University
Defendant
William Shelby McKenzie
Represented By
Brandon Kelly Black
Jones Walker LLP
contact info
Joseph (J.) E. Cullens, Jr.
Walters, Papillion ,thomas & Cullens LLC
contact info
John R Guenard
Jones Walker LLP
contact info
Darrel James Papillion
Walters, Papillion, Thomas, Cullens, LLC
contact info
Avery Bryce Pardee
Jones Walker LLP
contact info
Pauline F. Hardin
Jones, Walker
contact info
Renee' Chabert Crasto
Wptc
contact info
Defendant
Robert Yarborough
Represented By
Mary Katherine Price
Faircloth Melton Sobel And Bash, LLC
contact info
Jimmy Roy Faircloth, Jr.
Faircloth Melton Sobel & Bash, LLC
contact info
Barbara Bell Melton
Faircloth Melton, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Verge Ausberry
Represented By
Darren A. Patin
Hailey, Mcnamara, Hall, Larmann, & Papale
contact info
Defendant
Robert Barton
Represented By
Brandon Kelly Black
Jones Walker LLP
contact info
Joseph (J.) E. Cullens, Jr.
Walters, Papillion ,thomas & Cullens LLC
contact info
John R Guenard
Jones Walker LLP
contact info
Darrel James Papillion
Walters, Papillion, Thomas, Cullens, LLC
contact info
Avery Bryce Pardee
Jones Walker LLP
contact info
Pauline F. Hardin
Jones, Walker
contact info
Renee' Chabert Crasto
Wptc
contact info
Defendant
Vicki Crochet
Represented By
Brandon Kelly Black
Jones Walker LLP
contact info
Joseph (J.) E. Cullens, Jr.
Walters, Papillion ,thomas & Cullens LLC
contact info
John R Guenard
Jones Walker LLP
contact info
Darrel James Papillion
Walters, Papillion, Thomas, Cullens, LLC
contact info
Avery Bryce Pardee
Jones Walker LLP
contact info
Pauline F. Hardin
Jones, Walker
contact info
Renee' Chabert Crasto
Wptc
contact info
Defendant
Garrett Danos
Represented By
Mary Katherine Price
Faircloth Melton Sobel And Bash, LLC
contact info
Jimmy Roy Faircloth, Jr.
Faircloth Melton Sobel & Bash, LLC
contact info
Barbara Bell Melton
Faircloth Melton, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Jane Doe
Defendant
John Doe
Defendant
Stanley Jacobs
Represented By
Mary Katherine Price
Faircloth Melton Sobel And Bash, LLC
contact info
Jimmy Roy Faircloth, Jr.
Faircloth Melton Sobel & Bash, LLC
contact info
Barbara Bell Melton
Faircloth Melton, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Leslie Edwin Miles
Represented By
Jay C. Zainey, Jr.
The Lambert Firm, PLC
contact info
Peter R. Ginsberg
Moskowitz & Book, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Miriam Segar
Represented By
Mary Ann White
Shows, Cali & Walsh, L.L.P.
contact info
Jeffrey K. Cody
Shows, Cali, Berthelot & Walsh, LLP
contact info
John Carroll Walsh
Shows. Cali & Walsh, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Sharon Lewis
Represented By
Tammye Campbell Brown
Campbell Brown Law & Consulting
contact info
Bridgett Brown
Law Office Of Bridgett Brown
contact info
Larry English
English & Associates
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Taylor Porter Brooks & Phillips LLP
Terminated: 08/09/2021
Represented By
Brandon Kelly Black
Jones Walker LLP
contact info
Joseph (J.) E. Cullens, Jr.
Walters, Papillion ,thomas & Cullens LLC
contact info
John R Guenard
Jones Walker LLP
contact info
Darrel James Papillion
Walters, Papillion, Thomas, Cullens, LLC
contact info
Avery Bryce Pardee
Jones Walker LLP
contact info
Pauline F. Hardin
Jones, Walker
contact info
Renee' Chabert Crasto
Wptc
contact info
Defendant
Felton King Alexander
Terminated: 09/23/2021
Represented By
Evan M. Alvarez
Hammonds, Sills, Adkins & Guice, LLP
contact info
Alejandro R. Perkins
Hammonds, Sills, Adkins & Guice, LLP
contact info
Wayne Thomas Stewart
Hammonds & Sills
contact info
Defendant
F. King Alexander
Terminated: 05/05/2021
Defendant
Joe Alleva
Terminated: 05/05/2021
Defendant
Athletic Committee of the Board of Supervisors Louisiana State University
Terminated: 05/05/2021
Defendant
Shelby McKenzie
Terminated: 05/05/2021
Represented By
Brandon Kelly Black
Jones Walker LLP
contact info
Joseph (J.) E. Cullens, Jr.
Walters, Papillion ,thomas & Cullens LLC
contact info
John R Guenard
Jones Walker LLP
contact info
Darrel James Papillion
Walters, Papillion, Thomas, Cullens, LLC
contact info
Pauline F. Hardin
Jones, Walker
contact info
Renee' Chabert Crasto
Wptc
contact info

GPO Sep 10 2021
ORDER AND REASONS re 71 Motion to Dismiss. IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff Sharon Lewis's claims under Title IX and under 42 U.S.C. 1981 against Louisiana State University are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff Sharon Lewis's Title IX claims against the Board of Supervisors of Louisiana State University based on actions that occurred before 4/8/2020 are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Susie Morgan on 9/10/2021. (Payton, Paige)
GPO Sep 30 2021
the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, to the extent it is construed as a motion to disqualify Peter Ginsberg from representing Miles in this case, is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Susie Morgan on 9/30/2021. www.lamd.uscourts.gov/pro-hac-vice-e-filing-registration. (Payton, Paige)ORDER AND REASONS:IT IS ORDERED that Defendant Leslie Edwin "Les" Miles's 110 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Peter R. Ginsberg is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff Sharon Lewis's 113 Opposition to>ATTENTION: Local counsel shall provide the following link to those attorneys granted leave to proceed pro hac vice in the Middle District of Louisiana who choose to register for e-file access
GPO Dec 02 2021
ORDER AND REASONS: IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff's civil RICO claim and her claim under 42 U.S.C. 1981 against the Board of Supervisors of Louisiana State University are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the 67, 72, 76 motions to dismiss filed by Leslie Miles,Garret Danos, Robert Yarborough, Stanley Jacobs, and William Jenkins, are GRANTED. Plaintiff's civil RICO claims against Leslie Miles, Garret Danos, Robert Yarborough, Stanley Jacobs, and William Jenkins are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE as time barred. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the 60, 66, 71, 81, 98 motions to dismiss filed by William Shelby McKenzie, Vicki Crochet, Robert Barton, Miriam Segar, James Williams, Mary Leach Werner, Verge Ausberry, and Scott Woodward, are GRANTED IN PART to the extent they seek dismissal of Plaintiff's civil RICO claims based on injuries discovered or that should have been discovered before 4/8/2017. Plaintiff's civil RICO claims against William Shelby McKenzie, Vicki Crochet, Robert Barton, Miriam Segar, James Williams, Mary Leach Werner, Verge Ausberry, and Scott Woodward are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE to the extent based on injuries discovered or that should have been discovered before 4/8/2017. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff Sharon Lewis may seek leave of Court on or before 12/10/2021 to file a second amended complaint as stated herein. Plaintiff's 112 motion for leave is DENIED in all other respects. Signed by District Judge Susie Morgan on 12/2/2021. (Payton, Paige)

Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Friday, January 21, 2022
187 187 motion Miscellaneous Relief (First) Fri 01/21 6:45 PM
MOTION Entry of Protective Order and Agreed ESI Order by Board of Supervisors of Louisiana State University and Agricultural and Mechanical College.(Victorian, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Pleading; Protective Order,
Att: 2 Proposed Pleading; Agreed ESI Order
186 186 2 pgs order Order Fri 01/21 5:05 PM
ORDER: IT IS SO ORDERED that Plaintiff need not respond to Defendant Joseph Alleva's184 motion to dismiss Plaintiff's first amended complaint at this time. Signed by District Judge Susie Morgan on 1/21/2022. (Payton, Paige)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 19, 2022
185 185 8 pgs order Order on Motion to Alter Judgment Wed 01/19 12:12 PM
ORDER AND REASONS: IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff Sharon Lewis's168 Motion to Alter or Amend Judgment under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 59 be and hereby is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff Sharon Lewis may seek leave of Court on or before Thursday, 1/27/2022 to file a second amended complaint as stated herein. Signed by District Judge Susie Morgan on 1/19/2022. (Payton, Paige)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 14, 2022
184 184 motion Dismiss Fri 01/14 5:19 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by Joseph Alleva.(Barnett-Bernal, S.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support
183 183 motion Extension of Time Fri 01/14 1:25 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time ESI and Protective Order by All Plaintiffs.(English, Larry)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
182 182 2 pgs order Order Fri 01/14 12:29 PM
ORDER re Case Management Procedures referenced in the Court's169 Minute Entry - IT IS ORDERED that counsel for the parties in this action and in Owens shall file a proposed protective order and a proposed protocol for the production of ESI, noting any unresolved disputes, on or before Friday, January 21, 2022. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan. (Newell, Brad) Modified text on 1/14/2022 (TSF)
Related: [-]