ServiceMax v. Eclipse IP LLC
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | George H Wu |
Referred: | Andrew J Wistrich |
Case #: | 2:14-cv-05206 |
Nature of Suit | 830 Property Rights - Patent |
Cause | 28:1338 Patent Infringement |
Case Filed: | Jul 03, 2014 |
Terminated: | Oct 20, 2014 |
Last checked: Monday Jan 19, 2015 5:52 AM PST |
Counter Claimant
Eclipse IP LLC
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
ServiceMax
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Eclipse IP LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ServiceMax
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Tuesday, October 28, 2014 | ||
23 | 23 REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or Trademark. (Closing). (jp) | |
Att: 1 Order Dismissing | ||
Monday, October 20, 2014 | ||
22 | 22 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE21 by Judge George H. Wu that all claims, defenses, and counterclaims asserted in this action are dismissed with prejudice. FURTHER ORDERED that all attorneys' fees, costs of court and expenses shall be borne by each party incurring the same. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (jp) | |
Wednesday, October 15, 2014 | ||
21 | 21 STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) filed by Plaintiff ServiceMax.(Attorney Clement S Roberts added to party ServiceMax(pty:pla), Attorney Clement S Roberts added to party ServiceMax(pty:cd))(Roberts, Clement) | |
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, September 08, 2014 | ||
20 | 20 ANSWER to Counterclaim17 Plaintiff ServiceMax, Inc.'s Response to Defendant Eclipse IP LLC's Counterclaims filed by Plaintiff ServiceMax.(Durie, Daralyn) | |
Thursday, August 14, 2014 | ||
19 | 19 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Eclipse IP LLC, (Woods, Tyler) | |
18 | 18 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Eclipse IP LLC (Woods, Tyler) | |
17 | 17 COUNTERCLAIM against Counter Defendant ServiceMax; Jury Demand, filed by Counter Claimant Eclipse IP LLC.(Woods, Tyler) | |
16 | 16 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 JURY DEMAND. filed by Defendant Eclipse IP LLC.(Attorney Tyler J Woods added to party Eclipse IP LLC(pty:dft))(Woods, Tyler) | |
Thursday, August 07, 2014 | ||
15 | 15 MINUTES OF TELEPHONIC Status Conference held before Judge George H. Wu: The Court sets the following: (see attached for further details)Court Reporter: Katie Thibodeaux. (pj) | |
Friday, August 01, 2014 | ||
14 | 14 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff ServiceMax, upon Defendant Eclipse IP LLC served on 7/26/2014, answer due 8/16/2014. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Pete Sirianni Jr., Agent for Service of Process for Eclipse IP LLC in compliance with statute not specified by personal service. Original Summons NOT returned. (Durie, Daralyn) | |
Tuesday, July 15, 2014 | ||
13 | 13 Standing Order Re Final Pre-Trial Conferences for Civil Jury Trials by Judge George H. Wu. (See attached document for details.) (lom) | |
Monday, July 14, 2014 | ||
12 | 12 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 14-03 -Related Case- filed. Related Case No: CV 14-00154 GW(AJWx). Case transferred from Judge S. James Otero and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth to Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Wistrich for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge CV 14-05206 GW(AJWx). Signed by Judge George H. Wu (rn) | |
Wednesday, July 09, 2014 | ||
11 | 11 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by ServiceMax. (Durie, Daralyn) | |
Monday, July 07, 2014 | ||
10 | 10 NOTICE TO COUNSEL RE: Copyright, Patent and Trademark Reporting Requirements. Counsel shall file the appropriate AO-120 and/or AO-121 form with the Clerk within 10 days. (car) | |
9 | 9 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Eclipse IP LLC. (car) | |
8 | 8 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) | |
7 | 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge S. James Otero and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (car) | |
6 | 6 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiff ServiceMax. Related Case(s): 14-cv-00742 (Durie, Daralyn) | |
Thursday, July 03, 2014 | ||
5 | 5 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Elizabeth Offen Brown Klein on behalf of Movant ServiceMax (Attorney Elizabeth Offen Brown Klein added to party ServiceMax(pty:bkmov))(Klein, Elizabeth) | |
4 | 4 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Daralyn J Durie on behalf of Movant ServiceMax (Durie, Daralyn) | |
3 | 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 ServiceMax. (Durie, Daralyn) | |
2 | 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff ServiceMax, identifying Eclipse IP LLC. (Durie, Daralyn) | |
1 | 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-14067965 - Fee: $400. (Attorney Daralyn J Durie added to party ServiceMax(pty:bkmov))(Durie, Daralyn) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4, | ||
Att: 5 Civil Cover Sheet |