California Central District Court
Judge:David O Carter
Referred: Arthur Nakazato
Case #: 8:14-cv-01020
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Cause15:1121 Trademark Infringement
Case Filed:Jul 03, 2014
Terminated:Sep 30, 2014
Last checked: Monday Jan 19, 2015 5:53 AM PST
Defendant
Does
Defendant
Duke University
Represented By
Cristina C Longoria
Norton Rose Fulbright
contact info
John A O'Malley
Fulbright And Jaworski LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
John Wayne Enterprises, LLC
Represented By
Richard K Howell
Rutan And Tucker LLP
contact info
Ronald P Oines
Rutan And Tucker LLP
contact info
David H Hochner
Rutan & Tucker
contact info
Kathryn Diane Zajec Domin
Rutan And Tucker LLP
contact info
Jeffrey B Fohrer
Rutan And Tucker LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 12/02/2021 11:59 PM PST
Tuesday, September 30, 2014
32 32 REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or Trademark. (Closing) (twdb)
Related: [-]
31 31 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: granting10 Motion to Dismiss Case; vacating21 Motion to disqualify Counsel as moot. ( MD JS-6. Case Terminated ); (twdb)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 22, 2014
30 30 In Support of re: MOTION to Disqualify Counsel of Defendant 21 Response to Defendant's Objections to the Supplemental Declaration of Jayson Woodbridge filed by Plaintiff John Wayne Enterprises, LLC.(Hochner, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3
29 29 In Support of re: MOTION to Disqualify Counsel of Defendant 21 Response to Defendant's Objections to the Supplemental Declaration of Jayson Woodbridge in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Disqualify Defendant's Counsel filed by Plaintiff John Wayne Enterprises, LLC.(Hochner, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3
Friday, September 19, 2014
28 28 Evidentiary Objections to Supplemental Declaration of Jayson Woodbridge re: MOTION to Disqualify Counsel of Defendant 21 filed by Defendant Duke University.(O'Malley, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit of Service
Tuesday, September 16, 2014
27 27 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: VACATING HEARING AND taking under advisement21 Motion to disqualify Counsel. (twdb)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 15, 2014
26 26 DECLARATION In Support of Reply Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Disqualify Defendant's Counsel MOTION to Disqualify Counsel of Defendant 21 filed by Plaintiff John Wayne Enterprises, LLC.(Hochner, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
25 25 DECLARATION In Support of Reply Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Disqualify Defendant's Counsel MOTION to Disqualify Counsel of Defendant 21 filed by Plaintiff John Wayne Enterprises, LLC.(Hochner, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
24 24 REPLY MOTION to Disqualify Counsel of Defendant 21 filed by Plaintiff John Wayne Enterprises, LLC. (Hochner, David)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 08, 2014
23 23 Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Disqualify Defendants Counsel Opposition re: MOTION to Disqualify Counsel of Defendant 21 filed by Defendant Duke University.(O'Malley, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration Declaration of Stephen M. McNabb,
Att: 2 Declaration Declaration of John A. O'Malley,
Att: 3 Affidavit
Wednesday, September 03, 2014
22 22 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: Vacating Hearing and taking under advisement10 Motion to Dismiss Case. (twdb)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 29, 2014
21 21 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Disqualify Counsel of Defendant filed by Plaintiff John Wayne Enterprises, LLC. Motion set for hearing on 9/29/2014 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter.(Hochner, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum,
Att: 2 Declaration,
Att: 3 Exh. 1 - Decl. Hochner,
Att: 4 Exh. 2 - Decl. Hochner,
Att: 5 Exh. 3 - Decl. Hochner,
Att: 6 Exh. 4 - Decl. Hochner,
Att: 7 Exh. 5 - Decl. Hochner,
Att: 8 Exh. 6 - Decl. Hochner,
Att: 9 Exh. 7 - Decl. Hochner,
Att: 10 Declaration,
Att: 11 Exh. 1 - Decl. Woodbridge
Thursday, August 28, 2014
20 20 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: DENYING18 Plaintff's Ex Parte Application to Continue Hearing on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. See document for details. (mba)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 27, 2014
19 19 OPPOSITION to EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue from September 8, 2014 to October 6, 2014 Re: Objection/Opposition (Motion related),15 , MOTION to Dismiss Case 10 18 filed by Defendant Duke University. (O'Malley, John)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 26, 2014
18 18 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue from September 8, 2014 to October 6, 2014 Re: Objection/Opposition (Motion related),15 , MOTION to Dismiss Case 10 (Attorney David H Hochner added to party John Wayne Enterprises, LLC(pty:pla))(Hochner, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, August 25, 2014
17 17 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Duke University, re Reply (Motion related)16 to Dismiss served on 8/25/14. (Longoria, Cristina)
Related: [-]
16 16 REPLY MOTION to Dismiss Case 10 filed by Defendant Duke University. (Longoria, Cristina)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 18, 2014
15 15 Opposition in opposition re: MOTION to Dismiss Case 10 PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT DUKE UNIVERSITY'S MOTION TO DISMISS filed by Plaintiff John Wayne Enterprises, LLC.(Oines, Ronald)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Steven J. Goon in Support of Opposition to Motion to Dismiss
Friday, August 08, 2014
14 14 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge David O. Carter. Scheduling Conference set for 10/20/2014 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (See Order for details.) (jba)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 07, 2014
13 13 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by defendant Duke University, re Notice (Other)12 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties11 , MOTION to Dismiss Case 10 served on August 7, 2014. (O'Malley, John)
Related: [-]
12 12 NOTICE of Pendency of Other Actions or Proceedings filed by defendant Duke University. (O'Malley, John)
Related: [-]
11 11 CERTIFICATION and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Duke University, (O'Malley, John)
Related: [-]
10 10 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by defendant Duke University. Motion set for hearing on 9/8/2014 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter.(Attorney John A O'Malley added to party Duke University(pty:dft))(O'Malley, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum of Points of Authorities,
Att: 2 Declaration of Kate S. Hendricks,
Att: 3 Declaration of Susan Freya Olive,
Att: 4 Proposed Order
Thursday, July 31, 2014
9 9 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff John Wayne Enterprises, LLC, upon Defendant Duke University served on 7/17/2014, answer due 8/7/2014. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Margaret Huffner, General Counsel for Duke University in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Original Summons NOT returned. (Oines, Ronald)
Related: [-]
8 8 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Jeffrey B Fohrer counsel for Plaintiff John Wayne Enterprises, LLC. Adding Jeffrey B. Fohrer as attorney as counsel of record for John Wayne Enterprises, LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff John Wayne Enterprises, LLC. (Attorney Jeffrey B Fohrer added to party John Wayne Enterprises, LLC(pty:pla))(Fohrer, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 08, 2014
7 7 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by John Wayne Enterprises, LLC. (Oines, Ronald)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 07, 2014
5 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL RE: Copyright, Patent and Trademark Reporting Requirements. Counsel shall file the appropriate AO-120 and/or AO-121 form with the Clerk within 10 days. (nbo)
Related: [-]
4 4 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (nbo)
Related: [-]
3 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge Arthur Nakazato. (nbo)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 03, 2014
6 6 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery),1 as to Defendants Does 1-10 and Duke University. (nbo) (nbo).
Related: [-]
2 2 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff John Wayne Enterprises, LLC. (nbo)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT against Defendant Does 1-10 and Duke University. Case assigned to Judge David O. Carter for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Arthur Nakazato.(Filing fee $ 400 Paid) Jury Demanded. Filed by Plaintiff John Wayne Enterprises, LLC. (nbo)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (7/8/2014) Civil Cover Sheet
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery), 1 as to Defendants Does 1-10 and Duke University. (nbo)
Related: [-]