USA v. $5,000.00 in United States Currency et al
Colorado District Court | |
Judge: | Wiley Y Daniel |
Case #: | 1:14-cv-01900 |
Nature of Suit | 625 Forfeiture/Penalty - Drug Related Seizure of Property 21 USC 881 |
Cause | 21:881 Forfeiture Property-Drugs |
Case Filed: | Jul 08, 2014 |
Terminated: | Feb 02, 2015 |
Last checked: Monday Jan 19, 2015 5:26 AM MST |
Defendant
$1,436.29 in United States Currency
|
|
Defendant
$5,000.00 in United States Currency
|
|
Plaintiff
USA
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Monday, February 02, 2015 | ||
14 | 14
order
Judgment - Default
Mon 02/02 4:12 PM
DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of USA against $1,436.29 in United States Currency, $5,000.00 in United States Currency re:13 Order on Motion for Default Judgment, by Clerk on 2/2/2015. (evana, ) |
|
13 | 13
order
Order on Motion for Default Judgment
Mon 02/02 4:09 PM
ORDER granting12 the United States' Motion for Default and Final Order of Forfeiture as to defendant property. THAT default and forfeiture of defendant $5,000.00 in United States currency and defendant $1,436.29 in United States currency, including all right, title, and interest is hereby entered in favor of the United States pursuant to 21 U.S.C. ' 881; THAT the United States shall have full and legal title as to defendant $5,000.00 in United States currency and defendant $1,436.29 in United States currency and may dispose of said property in accordance with law, by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 2/2/2015.(evana, ) |
|
Friday, October 24, 2014 | ||
12 | 12 MOTION for Default Judgment as to defendants by Plaintiff USA.(Campbell, Wayne) | |
Att: 1 Proposed Order (PDF Only), | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Document | ||
Thursday, October 16, 2014 | ||
11 | 11 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to $1,436.29 in United States Currency, $5,000.00 in United States Currency re10 MOTION for Entry of Default as to defendants, by Clerk. Text Only Entry (evana, ) | |
10 | 10 MOTION for Entry of Default as to defendants by Plaintiff USA.(Campbell, Wayne) | |
Att: 1 Proposed Document | ||
Tuesday, October 14, 2014 | ||
9 | 9 NOTICE of Publication by Plaintiff USA(Campbell, Wayne) | |
Att: 1 Publication | ||
Thursday, July 31, 2014 | ||
8 | 8 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff USA. (Campbell, Wayne) | |
Thursday, July 10, 2014 | ||
7 | 7 CERTIFICATE of Mailing/Service re3 Magistrate Judge Consent Form,6 Notice (Other),1 Complaint, by Plaintiff USA. (Campbell, Wayne) | |
6 | 6 NOTICE of Complaint for Forfeiture by Plaintiff USA (Campbell, Wayne) | |
5 | 5 WARRANT of For Arrest of Property in Rem issued (evana, ) | |
4 | 4 ORDER FOR WARRANT for Arrest of Property in Rem by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 7/10/2014. (evana, ) | |
Tuesday, July 08, 2014 | ||
3 | 3 Magistrate Judge Consent Form issued pursuant to Local Rule. (sphil, ) | |
2 | 2 Case assigned to Judge Wiley Y. Daniel and drawn to Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland. Text Only Entry (sphil, ) | |
1 | 1 COMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE IN REM against $1,436.29 in United States Currency, $5,000.00 in United States Currency Attorney Wayne Campbell added to party USA(pty:pla), filed by USA.(Campbell, Wayne) | |
Att: 1 Proposed Order (PDF Only), | ||
Att: 2 Warrant for Arrest of Property In Rem, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet |