FCX SOLAR, LLC v. FTC SOLAR, INC.
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Ronnie Abrams |
Referred: | Valerie Figueredo |
Case #: | 1:21-cv-03556 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity Action |
Case Filed: | Apr 21, 2021 |
Last checked: Monday Oct 18, 2021 4:32 AM EDT |
Defendant
FTC Solar, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
FCX Solar, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 03/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, January 11, 2023 | ||
179 | 179
misc
Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal
Wed 01/11 10:34 AM
STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) FTC Solar, Inc. pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by FCX Solar, LLC. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). .Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-cv-03556-RA-VF, 1:21-cv-08766-RA.(Moffa, Matthew) |
|
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Voluntary Dismissal
Wed 01/11 8:47 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL. Notice to Attorney Matthew Moffa. RE-FILE Document No. 178 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the stipulation of voluntary dismissal was not physically signed by all parties who have appeared;. Re-file the document using the event type Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal found under the event list Other Documents - select the correct filer/filers - select the correct party/parties the voluntary dismissal is against - and attach the correct signed (scanned ink signature image) PDF. (tp) |
||
Tuesday, January 10, 2023 | ||
178 | 178
misc
Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal
Tue 01/10 12:31 PM
STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) FTC Solar, Inc. pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by FCX Solar, LLC. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). .Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-cv-03556-RA-VF, 1:21-cv-08766-RA.(Moffa, Matthew) |
|
Monday, January 09, 2023 | ||
177 | 177
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Stay
Mon 01/09 11:24 AM
ORDER granting (176) Letter Motion to Stay re: (176 in 1:21-cv-03556-RA-VF, 118 in 1:21-cv-08766-RA) JOINT LETTER MOTION to Stay re: (175 in 1:21-cv-03556-RA-VF) Order on Motion to Stay,, and Status Report addressed to Magistrate Judge Valerie Figueredo from The Parties dated January 6, 2023. in case 1:21-cv-03556-RA-VF; granting (118) Letter Motion to Stay re: (176 in 1:21-cv-03556-RA-VF, 118 in 1:21-cv-08766-RA) JOINT LETTER MOTION to Stay re: (175 in 1:21-cv-03556-RA-VF) Order on Motion to Stay,, and Status Report addressed to Magistrate Judge Valerie Figueredo from The Parties dated January 6, 2023. in case 1:21-cv-08766-RA. Application Granted.. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie Figueredo on 1/9/2023) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-cv-03556-RA-VF, 1:21-cv-08766-RA (rro) |
|
Friday, January 06, 2023 | ||
176 | 176
motion
Stay
Fri 01/06 4:40 PM
JOINT LETTER MOTION to Stay re: (175 in 1:21-cv-03556-RA-VF) Order on Motion to Stay,, and Status Report addressed to Magistrate Judge Valerie Figueredo from The Parties dated January 6, 2023. Document filed by FCX Solar, LLC.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-cv-03556-RA-VF, 1:21-cv-08766-RA.(Moffa, Matthew) |