Delta Air Lines Inc. v. Bombardier Inc.
Original Case: 1:20-cv-03025
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:21-cv-01028 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Case Filed: | Apr 23, 2021 |
Terminated: | Nov 23, 2021 |
Last checked: Wednesday Nov 24, 2021 3:34 AM EST |
Defendant
DEF
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
Bombardier Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ABC
|
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Delta Air Lines Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11/24/2021 3:28 AM EST |
Friday, April 23, 2021 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Delta Air Lines Inc., FILED. [3086177] 21-1028 [Entered: 04/26/2021 11:38 AM] | |
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax | ||
Att: 2 12 pgs Case FILED | ||
2 | 2 1 pgs DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 03/26/2021, RECEIVED.[3086178] 21-1028 [Entered: 04/26/2021 11:41 AM] | |
3 | 3 12 pgs PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Delta Air Lines Inc., district court receipt # ANYSDC-24446180, FILED.[3086179] 21-1028 [Entered: 04/26/2021 11:41 AM] | |
6 | 6 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3087144] 21-1028 [Entered: 04/27/2021 08:05 AM] | |
Att: 1 1 pgs Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed | ||
Att: 2 12 pgs Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED |