Boesen v. United Sports Publications, Lt
Original Case: 2:20-cv-01552
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:21-cv-01029 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Case Filed: | Apr 26, 2021 |
Terminated: | Feb 15, 2022 |
Last checked: Wednesday Feb 16, 2022 3:46 AM EST |
Defendant - Appellant
United Sports Publications, Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Michael Barrett Boesen
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 02/16/2022 3:39 AM EST |
Monday, April 26, 2021 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant United Sports Publications, Ltd., FILED. [3086319] 21-1029 [Entered: 04/26/2021 12:31 PM] | |
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax | ||
Att: 2 6 pgs Case FILED | ||
2 | 2 11 pgs DISTRICT COURT OPINION AND ORDER, dated 03/25/2021, RECEIVED.[3086344] 21-1029 [Entered: 04/26/2021 12:40 PM] | |
3 | 3 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3086359] 21-1029 [Entered: 04/26/2021 12:44 PM] | |
Att: 1 1 pgs Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed | ||
Att: 2 6 pgs Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED |