Cottam v. Global Emerging Capital Group,
Original Case: 1:16-cv-04584
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:21-cv-01031 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 850 Other Statutes - Securities/Commodities/Exchange |
Case Filed: | Apr 26, 2021 |
Terminated: | Nov 14, 2022 |
Last checked: Tuesday Nov 15, 2022 3:26 AM EST |
Defendant
Global Emerging Capital Group, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Alexander Kibrik
|
|
Defendant
Alexander Uchimoto
|
|
Defendant
Tejune Kang
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
6D Global Technologies, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
6D Acquisitions, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
John Cottam
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11/15/2022 3:24 AM EST |
Monday, April 26, 2021 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant John Cottam, FILED. [3086361] 21-1031 [Entered: 04/26/2021 12:44 PM] | |
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax | ||
Att: 2 60 pgs Case FILED | ||
2 | 2 15 pgs DISTRICT COURT OPINION AND ORDER, dated 03/31/2021, RECEIVED.[3086384] 21-1031 [Entered: 04/26/2021 12:48 PM] | |
3 | 3 1 pgs DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 03/31/2021, RECEIVED.[3086386] 21-1031 [Entered: 04/26/2021 12:48 PM] | |
4 | 4 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3086388] 21-1031 [Entered: 04/26/2021 12:49 PM] | |
Att: 1 1 pgs Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed | ||
Att: 2 61 pgs Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED | ||
5 | 5 1 pgs INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se litigant, SENT.[3086395] 21-1031 [Entered: 04/26/2021 12:50 PM] |