Wolfire Games LLC et al v. Valve Corporation
Washington Western District Court | |
Judge: | John C Coughenour |
Case #: | 2:21-cv-00563 |
Nature of Suit | 410 Other Statutes - Antitrust |
Cause | 15:15 Antitrust Litigation |
Case Filed: | Apr 27, 2021 |
Last checked: Wednesday Oct 27, 2021 2:28 AM PDT |
Consol Plaintiff
Susann Davis
|
Represented By
|
Consol Plaintiff
Ryan Lally
|
Represented By
|
Consol Plaintiff
Hope Marchionda
|
Represented By
|
Consol Plaintiff
Everett Stephens
|
Represented By
|
Consol Plaintiff
Sean Colvin
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Valve Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Dark Catt Studios Holdings Inc
|
|
Interested Party
Dark Catt Studios Interactive LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Daniel Escobar
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
William Herbert
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Wolfire Games LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
221 | 221
sealdoc
Sealed Document
Tue 04/09 4:02 PM
SEALED DOCUMENT Appendix 1 to Plaintiffs' Response to Defendant Valve Corporation's Motion to Seal by Consol Plaintiffs Dark Catt Studios Holdings Inc, Dark Catt Studios Interactive LLC, Plaintiff Wolfire Games LLC re198 MOTION to Seal ,215 Praecipe-Other,220 Praecipe-Other,210 Response to Motion,211 Sealed Document, (Cobb, Alicia) |
|
220 | 220
misc
Praecipe-Other
Tue 04/09 3:55 PM
PRAECIPE re211 Sealed Document,215 Praecipe-Other,210 Response to Motion to Seal by Consol Plaintiffs Dark Catt Studios Holdings Inc, Dark Catt Studios Interactive LLC, Plaintiff Wolfire Games LLC (Cobb, Alicia) |
|
Friday, April 05, 2024 | ||
219 | 219
respm
Declaration
Fri 04/05 8:27 PM
DECLARATION of Hideki Hayakawa filed by Defendant Valve Corporation re198 MOTION to Seal (Marks-Dias, Blake) |
|
218 | 218
respm
Declaration
Fri 04/05 8:26 PM
DECLARATION of Raphael van Lierop filed by Defendant Valve Corporation re198 MOTION to Seal (Marks-Dias, Blake) |
|
217 | 217
respm
Declaration
Fri 04/05 8:24 PM
DECLARATION of Blake Marks-Dias filed by Defendant Valve Corporation re198 MOTION to Seal(Marks-Dias, Blake) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Appendix A | ||
216 | 216
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Fri 04/05 8:22 PM
REPLY, filed by Defendant Valve Corporation, TO RESPONSE to198 MOTION to Seal(Marks-Dias, Blake) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, April 03, 2024 | ||
215 | 215
misc
Praecipe-Other
Wed 04/03 6:28 PM
PRAECIPE re210 Response to Motion to Seal by Consol Plaintiffs Dark Catt Studios Holdings Inc, Dark Catt Studios Interactive LLC, Plaintiff Wolfire Games LLC(Cobb, Alicia) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
214 | 214
respm
Declaration
Wed 04/03 3:48 PM
DECLARATION of Peter Ryan filed by Intervenor Apeirogon Games re198 MOTION to Seal (Chandler, Blythe) |
|
213 | 213
respm
Response to Motion
Wed 04/03 3:46 PM
RESPONSE, by Intervenor Apeirogon Games, to198 MOTION to Seal . (Chandler, Blythe) |
|
212 | 212
motion
Intervene
Wed 04/03 3:43 PM
MOTION to Intervene Attorney Blythe H Chandler added to party Apeirogon Games(pty:intv), filed by Intervenor Apeirogon Games. Noting Date 4/19/2024, (Chandler, Blythe) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order |