Bey v. DeVos
Original Case: 1:19-cv-02463
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:21-cv-01039 |
Type | civil / united states |
Nature of Suit | 152 Contract - Recovery of Defaulted Student Loans (Excl. Veterans) |
Case Filed: | Apr 26, 2021 |
Terminated: | Nov 19, 2021 |
Last checked: Tuesday Nov 23, 2021 3:37 AM EST |
Defendant - Appellee
Betsy DeVos, Secretary of Education
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
United States Department of Education
|
Represented By
Matthew Joseph Mailloux
United States Attorney's Office for the Eastern District of New contact info |
Defendant - Appellee
Miguel A. Cardona, Secretary of Education
|
Represented By
Matthew Joseph Mailloux
United States Attorney's Office for the Eastern District of New contact info |
Plaintiff - Appellant
Jamel Ali-Bey
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11/23/2021 3:34 AM EST |
Monday, April 26, 2021 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Jamel Ali-Bey, FILED. [3087303] 21-1039 [Entered: 04/27/2021 09:59 AM] | |
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax | ||
Att: 2 6 pgs Case FILED | ||
2 | 2 16 pgs DISTRICT COURT MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, dated 03/31/2021, RECEIVED.[3087314] 21-1039 [Entered: 04/27/2021 10:04 AM] | |
3 | 3 1 pgs DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 03/31/2021, RECEIVED.[3087316] 21-1039 [Entered: 04/27/2021 10:04 AM] | |
4 | 4 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3087319] 21-1039 [Entered: 04/27/2021 10:05 AM] | |
Att: 1 1 pgs Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed | ||
Att: 2 5 pgs Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED |