Perkins v. Rome Memorial Hospital
Original Case: 6:20-cv-00196
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:21-cv-01040 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Apr 26, 2021 |
Terminated: | Oct 12, 2021 |
Last checked: Wednesday Oct 13, 2021 4:28 AM EDT |
Defendant - Appellee
Rome Memorial Hospital
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Medical Doctor Mitchell R. Rubinovich
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Victor Perkins
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 10/13/2021 4:24 AM EDT |
Monday, April 26, 2021 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Victor Perkins, FILED. [3087351] 21-1040 [Entered: 04/27/2021 10:16 AM] | |
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax | ||
Att: 2 10 pgs Case FILED | ||
2 | 2 11 pgs DISTRICT COURT MEMORANDUM-DECISION AND ORDER, dated 04/19/2021, RECEIVED.[3087355] 21-1040 [Entered: 04/27/2021 10:19 AM] | |
3 | 3 2 pgs DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 04/20/2021, RECEIVED.[3087357] 21-1040 [Entered: 04/27/2021 10:20 AM] | |
4 | 4 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3087358] 21-1040 [Entered: 04/27/2021 10:20 AM] | |
Att: 1 1 pgs Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed | ||
Att: 2 9 pgs Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED |