United States of America v. Naylor-Legg et al
West Virginia Southern District Court | |
Case #: | 2:21-cr-00062 |
Case Filed: | Apr 27, 2021 |
Last checked: Thursday Sep 28, 2023 4:54 PM EDT |
Defendant
Larry Allen Clay, Jr. (1)
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
United States of America
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Kristen Naylor-Legg (2)
Terminated: 08/31/2023
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 03/23/2024 9:05 AM EDT |
Wednesday, March 24, 2021 | ||
1 | 1 1 pgs SEALED MOTION by United States of America to Seal. (lca) | |
1 | 1 1 pgs MOTION by United States of America to Seal as to Kristen Naylor-Legg. (lca) | |
2 | 2 1 pgs SEALED ORDER as to Larry Allen Clay, Jr., granting the1 Motion to Seal; upon the defendant's arrest, this case shall be unsealed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dwane L. Tinsley on 3/24/2021. (cc: Judge, USA) (lca) | |
2 | 2 1 pgs SEALED ORDER as to Kristen Naylor-Legg; granting the1 Motion to Seal; directing that upon defendant's arrest, this case shall be unsealed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dwane L. Tinsley on 3/24/2021. (cc: Judge, USA) (lca) | |
3 | 3 1 pgs COMPLAINT as to Larry Allen Clay, Jr. (Attachment: #1 Affidavit) (lca) | |
3 | 3 1 pgs COMPLAINT as to Kristen Naylor-Legg. (Attachment: #1 Affidavit) (lca) | |
Friday, March 26, 2021 | ||
CASE UNSEALED as to Larry Allen Clay, Jr pursuant to request of chambers. (ts) | ||
CASE UNSEALED as to Kristen Naylor-Legg pursuant to request of chambers. (ts) | ||
5 | 5 3 pgs MOTION by United States of America for Detention Hearing as to Larry Allen Clay, Jr. (Rada Herrald, Jennifer) | |
5 | 5 3 pgs MOTION by United States of America for Detention Hearing as to Kristen Naylor-Legg. (Rada Herrald, Jennifer) | |
6 | 6 CJA 23 FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT by Larry Allen Clay, Jr. (kew) | |
6 | 6 1 pgs INITIAL APPEARANCE as to Kristen Naylor-Legg held by Magistrate Judge Dwane L. Tinsley on 3/26/2021; Court Reporter: Court Smart. (kab) | |
7 | 7 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Wesley P. Page APPEARING FOR Larry Allen Clay, Jr. (Page, Wesley) | |
7 | 7 1 pgs DUE PROCESS PROTECTIONS ACT ORDER TO ALL COUNSEL REGARDING BRADY OBLIGATIONS as to Kristen Naylor-Legg. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dwane L. Tinsley on 3/26/2021. (cc: Judge, USA, counsel of record) (kew) | |
8 | 8 1 pgs INITIAL APPEARANCE as to Larry Allen Clay, Jr held by Magistrate Judge Dwane L. Tinsley on 3/26/2021; Court Reporter: Court Smart. (kab) | |
8 | 8 2 pgs ORDER as to Kristen Naylor-Legg, upon hearing held 3/26/2021, scheduling a Preliminary Hearing for 3/31/2021 at 1:30 p.m., in Charleston, before Magistrate Judge Dwane L. Tinsley; granting the5 MOTION by United States of America for Detention Hearing as to Kristen Naylor-Legg and scheduling a Detention Hearing for 3/31/2021 at 1:30 p.m., in Charleston, before Magistrate Judge Dwane L. Tinsley; detaining and remanding the defendant to the custody of the U. S. Marshal pending further proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dwane L. Tinsley on 3/26/2021. (cc: Judge, defendant, all counsel of record, USP, USM) (slr) | |
9 | 9 1 pgs DUE PROCESS PROTECTIONS ACT ORDER TO ALL COUNSEL REGARDING BRADY OBLIGATIONS as to Larry Allen Clay, Jr. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dwane L. Tinsley on 3/26/2021. (cc: Judge, USA, counsel of record) (kew) | |
10 | 10 1 pgs NOTICE of Assertion of Right to Remain Silent and Not Be Questioned by Any Authorities Outside the Presence of Counsel as to Larry Allen Clay, Jr. (Page, Wesley) | |
11 | 11 2 pgs ORDER as to Larry Allen Clay, Jr. upon hearing held 3/26/2021, directing that the Federal Public Defender represent the defendant in this matter; scheduling a Preliminary Hearing for 3/31/2021 at 2:30 p.m., in Charleston, before Magistrate Judge Dwane L. Tinsley; granting the5 MOTION by United States of America for Detention Hearing as to Larry Allen Clay, Jr. and scheduling a Detention Hearing for 3/31/2021 at 2:30 p.m., in Charleston, before Magistrate Judge Dwane L. Tinsley; detaining and remanding the defendant to the custody of the U. S. Marshal pending further proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dwane L. Tinsley on 3/26/2021. (cc: Judge, defendant, all counsel of record, USP, USM) (slr) | |
Tuesday, March 30, 2021 | ||
NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re:13 Warrant Returned Executed. ERROR: Incorrect document attached. CORRECTION: Incorrect image removed and replaced with correct image. (lca) [2:21-mj-00069] | ||
9 | 9 PRETRIAL SERVICES REPORT as to Kristen Naylor-Legg. (tmp) | |
10 | 10 WARRANT RETURNED EXECUTED in case as to Kristen Naylor-Legg. Defendant arrested on 3/26/2021. (lca) | |
11 | 11 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: James W. Keenan APPEARING FOR Kristen Naylor-Legg (Keenan, James) | |
12 | 12 PRETRIAL SERVICES REPORT as to Larry Allen Clay, Jr. (tmp) | |
13 | 13 1 pgs WARRANT RETURNED EXECUTED in case as to Larry Allen Clay, Jr. Defendant arrested on 3/26/2021. (lca) (Modified on 3/31/2021 to replace document) (lca) | |
Wednesday, March 31, 2021 | ||
12 | 12 1 pgs PRELIMINARY HEARING and DETENTION HEARING as to Kristen Naylor-Legg held by Magistrate Judge Dwane L. Tinsley on 3/31/2021; Court Reporter: Court Smart. (kab) | |
14 | 14 1 pgs PRELIMINARY HEARING and DETENTION HEARING as to Larry Allen Clay, Jr held by Magistrate Judge Dwane L. Tinsley on 3/31/2021; Court Reporter: Court Smart. (kab) | |
Thursday, April 01, 2021 | ||
13 | 13 1 pgs WAIVER OF RIGHT TO A DETENTION HEARING as to Kristen Naylor-Legg. (lca) | |
14 | 14 1 pgs WITNESS LIST by United States of America as to Kristen Naylor-Legg, re: hearing held 3/31/2021. (kew) (Modified on 4/2/2021 to remove and replace image)(slr) | |
15 | 15 1 pgs WAIVER OF PRELIMINARY HEARING by Larry Allen Clay, Jr. (kew) | |
15 | 15 2 pgs ORDER as to Kristen Naylor-Legg, upon hearing held 3/31/2021; directing the defendant to appear for further proceedings; the defendant is remanded to the custody of the United States Marshal pending further proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dwane L. Tinsley on 4/1/2021. (cc: Judge, USA, USP, USM, counsel, deft) (kew) | |
16 | 16 1 pgs WITNESS LIST by Larry Allen Clay, Jr., re: hearing held 3/31/2021. (kew) (Modified on 4/2/2021 to remove and replace image)(slr) | |
17 | 17 2 pgs ORDER as to Larry Allen Clay, Jr; re: hearing held 3/31/2021; directing that the defendant shall appear for further proceedings and the defendant is remanded to the custody of the United States Marshal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dwane L. Tinsley on 4/1/2021. (cc: Judge, USP, USM, counsel of record, deft) (lca) | |
18 | 18 3 pgs DETENTION ORDER as to Larry Allen Clay, Jr. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dwane L. Tinsley on 4/1/2021. (cc: Judge, USA, USP, USM, counsel) (lca) | |
Friday, April 02, 2021 | ||
NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re:16 WITNESS LIST by Larry Allen Clay, Jr., re: hearing held 3/31/2021. ERROR: Image was not flattened. CORRECTION: Flattened and replaced image. (slr) | ||
NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re:14 WITNESS LIST by United States of America as to Kristen Naylor-Legg, re: hearing held 3/31/2021. ERROR: Image was not flattened. CORRECTION: Flattened and replaced image. (slr) | ||
16 | 16 CJA 23 FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT by Kristen Naylor-Legg. (lca) | |
19 | 19 2 pgs TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Larry Allen Clay, Jr. for proceedings held on 3/31/2021 before Magistrate Judge Dwane L. Tinsley. (Page, Wesley) | |
Monday, April 05, 2021 | ||
20 | 20 29 pgs TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS of Preliminary and Detention Hearing, as to Larry Allen Clay, Jr held on March 31, 2021 before Magistrate Judge Dwane L. Tinsley. Court Reporter Catherine Schutte-Stant, Telephone number 304-347-3151. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due 4/15/2021. Redaction Request due 4/26/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/6/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/6/2021. (css) | |
Tuesday, April 06, 2021 | ||
MOTION as to Larry Allen Clay, Jr referred to Judge Irene Berger:21 APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION TO DISTRICT COURT/MOTION for Revocation of Magistrate Judge Tinsley's18 Detention Order and Reconsideration for Bond as to Larry Allen Clay, Jr. (ts) [2:21-mj-00069] | ||
21 | 21 13 pgs APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION TO DISTRICT COURT/MOTION for Revocation of Magistrate Judge Tinsley's18 Detention Order and Reconsideration for Bond as to Larry Allen Clay, Jr. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A)(Page, Wesley) Modified text on 4/14/2021 (cbo) | |
Friday, April 09, 2021 | ||
17 | 17 2 pgs MOTION for Leave to Withdraw as Counsel as to Kristen Naylor-Legg by James W Keenan. (Keenan, James) | |
Monday, April 12, 2021 | ||
18 | 18 1 pgs ORDER granting17 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney; directing that L. Thompson Price shall represent the defendant. This Order is entered nunc pro tunc as of 4/8/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dwane L. Tinsley on 4/12/2021. (cc: Judge, USP, USM, counsel of record, deft, CJA Supervising Attorney) (lca) | |
Wednesday, April 14, 2021 | ||
22 | 22 12 pgs RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION by United States of America as to Larry Allen Clay, Jr. re:21 MOTION for Revocation of Magistrate Judge Tinsley's18 Detention Order and MOTION for Reconsideration for Bond as to Larry Allen Clay, Jr. (Rada Herrald, Jennifer) | |
Friday, April 16, 2021 | ||
23 | 23 3 pgs MOTION by United States of America to Amend the22 Response In Opposition, filed by United States of America as to Larry Allen Clay, Jr. (Rada Herrald, Jennifer) | |
24 | 24 11 pgs REPLY by Larry Allen Clay, Jr. re:22 Response In Opposition (Page, Wesley) | |
Monday, April 19, 2021 | ||
25 | 25 9 pgs MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying21 MOTION for Revocation of Magistrate Judge Tinsley's Detention Order and for Reconsideration for Bond by Larry Allen Clay Jr.; granting government's23 MOTION to Amend the Response of the United States to Defendant's Motion for Revocation of Magistrate Judge Tinsley's Detention Order and for Reconsideration for Bond as to Larry Allen Clay Jr. Signed by Judge Irene C. Berger on 4/19/2021. (cc: Judge, USA, USP, USM, counsel, deft, Mag. Judge Tinsley) (tmr) | |
Friday, April 23, 2021 | ||
26 | 26 8 pgs MOTION by United States of America for Entry of a Protective Order Governing Discovery Relating to Minor Victim and Recordings as to Larry Allen Clay, Jr. (Attachment: #1 Proposed Order)(Rada Herrald, Jennifer) | |
27 | 27 3 pgs PROTECTIVE ORDER GOVERNING DISCOVERY RELATING TO MINOR VICTIMS AND RECORDINGS granting government's26 MOTION for Protective Order as to Larry Allen Clay Jr. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dwane L. Tinsley on 4/23/2021. (cc: Judge, USA, USP, USM, counsel) (tmr) | |
Tuesday, April 27, 2021 | ||
ATTORNEY UPDATE in case as to Larry Allen Clay, Jr, Kristen Naylor-Legg. Attorney Jennifer Rada Herrald for United States of America added. (tmr) | ||
CASE as to Kristen Naylor-Legg, Larry Allen Clay, Jr assigned to Judge Joseph R. Goodwin. (klc) | ||
19 | 19 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: William C. Forbes APPEARING FOR Kristen Naylor-Legg (Forbes, William) | |
28 | 28 4 pgs INDICTMENT as to Larry Allen Clay, Jr. (1) counts 1-2, Kristen Naylor-Legg (2) counts 1, 3. (tmr) Modified filed date on 4/28/2021 (cbo). | |
29 | 29 INDICTMENT - Unredacted Copy for Court Users Only as to Kristen Naylor-Legg, Larry Allen Clay, Jr. (tmr) |