Villa v. Southwest Credit Systems, L.P.
Original Case: 1:19-cv-01701
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:21-cv-01057 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit |
Case Filed: | Apr 27, 2021 |
Terminated: | Oct 12, 2021 |
Last checked: Wednesday Oct 13, 2021 4:30 AM EDT |
Defendant - Appellee
Southwest Credit Systems, L.P.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Steve Villa
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 10/13/2021 4:26 AM EDT |
Tuesday, April 27, 2021 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Steve Villa, FILED. [3088464] 21-1057 [Entered: 04/28/2021 11:27 AM] | |
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax | ||
Att: 2 6 pgs Case FILED | ||
2 | 2 2 pgs DISTRICT COURT DECISION AND ORDER, dated 03/25/2021, RECEIVED.[3088474] 21-1057 [Entered: 04/28/2021 11:31 AM] | |
3 | 3 1 pgs DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 03/26/2021, RECEIVED.[3088476] 21-1057 [Entered: 04/28/2021 11:32 AM] | |
4 | 4 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Steve Villa, district court receipt # 0209-4228725, FILED.[3088480] 21-1057 [Entered: 04/28/2021 11:33 AM] |