Xu v. The City of New York
Original Case: 1:08-cv-11339
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:21-cv-01059 |
Type | civil / united states |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Case Filed: | Apr 28, 2021 |
Terminated: | Jun 30, 2023 |
Last checked: Tuesday Jul 04, 2023 4:28 AM EDT |
Defendant
Dr. Jane R. Zucker
|
|
Defendant
Dennis J. King
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
The City of New York, other The New York City Department of Health and Mental Hygiene
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Brenda M. McIntyre
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
City of New York, other The New York City Department of Health and Mental Hygiene
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Yan Ping Xu
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 07/04/2023 4:25 AM EDT |
Wednesday, April 28, 2021 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Yan Ping Xu, FILED. [3088462] 21-1059 [Entered: 04/28/2021 11:25 AM] | |
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax | ||
Att: 2 37 pgs Case FILED | ||
2 | 2 11 pgs DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 03/31/2021, RECEIVED.[3088466] 21-1059 [Entered: 04/28/2021 11:28 AM] | |
5 | 5 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3088473] 21-1059 [Entered: 04/28/2021 11:31 AM] | |
Att: 1 1 pgs Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed | ||
Att: 2 38 pgs Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED | ||
6 | 6 1 pgs INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se litigant, SENT.[3088479] 21-1059 [Entered: 04/28/2021 11:32 AM] |