Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:19-bk-36313

Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:David R Jones
Case #: 4:21-ap-03129
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Apr 28, 2021
Terminated:Oct 19, 2023
Last checked: never
Defendant
Total Machine Solutions, Inc.
79A Express Street P.O. Box 799
Plainview, NY 11803
Represented By
Total Machine Solutions, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Dean Foods Company
2711 Haskell Avenue Suite 3400
Dallas, TX 75204
Represented By
Gary D. Underdahl
Ask LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Monday, October 30, 2023
11 11 trustee Remark (batch) Mon 10/30 11:28 AM
Remark: Judge Christopher M. Lopez added to case. Involvement of Judge Marvin Isgur Terminated. . (RosarioSaldana)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 19, 2023
court Close Adversary Case Thu 10/19 11:41 AM
Voluntary Dismissal Under Rule 41. Adversary Case 4:21-ap-3129 Closed. (TylerLaws)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 10, 2021
10 10 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Fri 09/10 10:47 AM
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Filed by Daniel H. Golden(Casteel, Kara)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Thursday, September 09, 2021
9 9 notice Notice Thu 09/09 11:30 AM
Notice of Scheduling of Mediation . Filed by Daniel H. Golden(Casteel, Kara)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Thursday, August 12, 2021
8 8 notice Notice Thu 08/12 12:56 PM
Notice of Selection of Mediator . Filed by Daniel H. Golden (Casteel, Kara)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 21, 2021
7 7 notice Notice Mon 06/21 9:49 PM
Notice of Service of Plaintiffs Initial Disclosures . Filed by Dean Foods Company (Casteel, Kara)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 13, 2021
6 6 cmp Summons Service Executed Thu 05/13 11:32 AM
Summons Service Executed on Total Machine Solutions, Inc. 5/11/2021. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 06, 2021
5 5 court Summons Issued Thu 05/06 6:06 AM
Summons Issued on Total Machine Solutions, Inc. Date Issued 5/6/2021. (hler)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 04, 2021
4 4 misc Summons - Request for Issuance Tue 05/04 11:28 AM
Request for Issuance of Summons on Total Machine Solutions, Inc.. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-]
Saturday, May 01, 2021
3 3 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 05/01 11:37 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 05/01/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 2 Order Regarding the Exchange of Exhibits and Witness lists in all contested matters and adversary proceedings
Thursday, April 29, 2021
2 2 order Judge Jones Order Regarding Exhibit and Witness Lists (Adversary) Thu 04/29 6:00 AM
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 28, 2021
1 1 cmp Complaint [system event] Wed 04/28 2:09 PM
Adversary case 21-03129 Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)), (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Complaint by Dean Foods Company against Total Machine Solutions, Inc.. Fee Amount $350 (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A