Singh v. Excel Security Corp
Original Case: 1:14-cv-10111
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:21-cv-01092 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Case Filed: | Apr 27, 2021 |
Terminated: | Jun 17, 2022 |
Last checked: Monday Jun 20, 2022 4:28 AM EDT |
Defendant
Excel Security Corp
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
RXR 620 Master Lease, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
RXR Property Managment LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Securitas Security Services Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
John Does 1-5
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
ABC Corps 1-5, fictitious names
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
Excel Security Corp
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Harindeer Jeet Singh
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Harinder Jeet Singh
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 06/20/2022 4:24 AM EDT |
Tuesday, April 27, 2021 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Harinder Jeet Singh, FILED. [3090228] 21-1092 [Entered: 04/29/2021 09:38 PM] | |
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax | ||
Att: 2 21 pgs Case FILED | ||
2 | 2 20 pgs DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 03/30/2021, RECEIVED.[3090229] 21-1092 [Entered: 04/29/2021 09:41 PM] | |
3 | 3 1 pgs DISTRICT COURT JUDGEMENT, dated 03/31/2021, RECEIVED.[3090230] 21-1092 [Entered: 04/29/2021 09:41 PM] | |
4 | 4 1 pgs PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Harinder Jeet Singh, USCA receipt # 465401278460, FILED.[3090232] 21-1092 [Entered: 04/29/2021 09:42 PM] | |
5 | 5 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3090233] 21-1092 [Entered: 04/29/2021 09:43 PM] | |
Att: 1 1 pgs Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed | ||
Att: 2 21 pgs Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED | ||
16 | 16 1 pgs INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se litigant, SENT.[3095658] 21-1092 [Entered: 05/07/2021 09:37 AM] |