Daou v. BLC Bank, S.A.L.
Original Case: 1:20-cv-04438
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:21-cv-01085 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Case Filed: | Apr 28, 2021 |
Terminated: | Jul 28, 2022 |
Last checked: Friday Jul 29, 2022 5:46 AM EDT |
Defendant - Appellee
BLC Bank, S.A.L.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Credit Libanais, S.A.L.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
AlMawarid Bank, S.A.L.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Banque du Liban
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Joseph A. Daou
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Karen Daou
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Jul 28 2022
OPINION, affirming the judgment of the district court, by GEL, JFB, WJN, FILED.[3355688] [21-1085] |
Docket last updated: 07/29/2022 5:42 AM EDT |
Wednesday, April 28, 2021 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Joseph A. Daou and Karen Daou, FILED. [3089797] 21-1085 [Entered: 04/29/2021 01:29 PM] | |
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax | ||
Att: 2 15 pgs Case FILED | ||
2 | 2 25 pgs DISTRICT COURT OPINION AND ORDER, dated 04/09/2021, RECEIVED.[3089803] 21-1085 [Entered: 04/29/2021 01:33 PM] | |
3 | 3 1 pgs DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 04/12/2021, RECEIVED.[3089805] 21-1085 [Entered: 04/29/2021 01:34 PM] | |
4 | 4 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Joseph A. Daou and Karen Daou, district court receipt # ANYSDC-24465962, FILED.[3089808] 21-1085 [Entered: 04/29/2021 01:35 PM] | |
5 | 5 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3089811] 21-1085 [Entered: 04/29/2021 01:36 PM] | |
Att: 1 1 pgs Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed | ||
Att: 2 16 pgs Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED |