Taurisano v. Tabb
Original Case: 6:19-cv-01637
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:21-cv-01080 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Apr 28, 2021 |
Terminated: | May 12, 2021 |
Last checked: Thursday May 13, 2021 4:31 AM EDT |
Defendant
Hoyt Murphy Realtors
|
|
Defendant
Ocean Village Rentals
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
David Randy Tabb, AKA Randy Tabb
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Deborah Tabb
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Coldwell Banker Paradise
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Ed Schlitt Realtors
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Michael P. Taurisano, Husband of Gayle Taurisano
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Gayle Taurisano
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/13/2021 4:27 AM EDT |
Friday, April 02, 2021 | ||
4 | 4 2 pgs DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 03/31/2021, RECEIVED.[3089670] 21-1080 [Entered: 04/29/2021 12:02 PM] | |
Wednesday, April 28, 2021 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Gayle Taurisano and Michael P. Taurisano, FILED. [3089660] 21-1080 [Entered: 04/29/2021 11:55 AM] | |
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax | ||
Att: 2 9 pgs Case FILED | ||
2 | 2 17 pgs DISTRICT COURT MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER, dated 03/15/2021, RECEIVED.[3089665] 21-1080 [Entered: 04/29/2021 11:59 AM] | |
3 | 3 3 pgs DISTRICT COURT SUMMARY ORDER, dated 03/31/2021, RECEIVED.[3089669] 21-1080 [Entered: 04/29/2021 12:01 PM] | |
5 | 5 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Gayle Taurisano and Michael P. Taurisano, district court receipt # ANYNDC-5507004, FILED.[3089675] 21-1080 [Entered: 04/29/2021 12:03 PM] | |
6 | 6 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3089678] 21-1080 [Entered: 04/29/2021 12:04 PM] | |
Att: 1 1 pgs Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed | ||
Att: 2 8 pgs Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED |