McCarroll v. Gill
Original Case: 3:20-cv-00457
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:21-cv-01094 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 410 Other Statutes - Antitrust |
Case Filed: | Apr 29, 2021 |
Terminated: | Jun 11, 2021 |
Last checked: Monday Jun 14, 2021 4:29 AM EDT |
Defendant - Appellee
Charles Gill, General Counsel, United Technologies
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
Frank Jiminez, General Counsel, Raytheon
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
Lamont, Governor, State of Connecticut
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
Blumenthal, Senator, State of Connecticut
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
John D. McCarroll, Formerly United Technologies
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
William Barr, Attorney, Attorney General, United States
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
George Goodridge, Mr., Formerly Counsel Ernhart, a Division of Stanley, Black and Decker
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
Karen Marceau, Office of the General Counsel, United Technologies
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
Deana Kadra, Ms., Raytheon
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
Dana Ng, Mr., Raytheon
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
Halloran, Mr., Halloran + Sage
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
William Tong, Mr., Attorney General, Connecticut
|
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Margaret McCarroll
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 06/14/2021 4:27 AM EDT |
Thursday, April 29, 2021 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Margaret McCarroll, FILED. [3090237] 21-1094 [Entered: 04/29/2021 10:09 PM] | |
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax | ||
Att: 2 20 pgs Case FILED | ||
2 | 2 1 pgs DISTRICT COURT ORDER, entered on the district court docket sheet as entry dated 03/29/2021, RECEIVED.[3090238] 21-1094 [Entered: 04/29/2021 10:33 PM] |