Ashley v. Bridgeport
Original Case: 3:17-cv-00724
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:21-cv-01091 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Apr 29, 2021 |
Terminated: | Aug 06, 2021 |
Last checked: Monday Aug 09, 2021 4:30 AM EDT |
Defendant - Appellee
City of Bridgeport
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Ronald Mercado, Lt., individually and as a Lt. of the Bridgeport Police Department
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Roderick Doda, P.O., individually and as an Officer of the Bridgeport Police Department
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Marie Cetti, P.O., individually and as an Officer of the Bridgeport Police Department
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
St. Vincent's Medical Center
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Malcolm O. Ashley
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 08/09/2021 4:27 AM EDT |
Thursday, April 29, 2021 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Malcolm O. Ashley, FILED. [3090176] 21-1091 [Entered: 04/29/2021 05:32 PM] | |
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax | ||
Att: 2 31 pgs Case FILED | ||
2 | 2 2 pgs DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 03/31/2021, RECEIVED.[3090177] 21-1091 [Entered: 04/29/2021 05:34 PM] | |
3 | 3 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Malcolm O. Ashley, district court receipt # ACTDC-6488475, FILED.[3090178] 21-1091 [Entered: 04/29/2021 05:35 PM] |