City of New York v. Fleet General Insurance Group
Original Case: 1:19-cv-06629
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:21-cv-01084 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Case Filed: | Apr 29, 2021 |
Terminated: | Aug 24, 2021 |
Last checked: Wednesday Aug 25, 2021 4:38 AM EDT |
Defendant - Appellant
Fleet General Insurance Group, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
City of New York
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 08/25/2021 4:30 AM EDT |
Thursday, April 29, 2021 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Fleet General Insurance Group, Inc., FILED. [3089748] 21-1084 [Entered: 04/29/2021 12:46 PM] | |
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax | ||
Att: 2 6 pgs Case FILED | ||
2 | 2 5 pgs DISTRICT COURT ORDER, entered in the district court as docket entry dated 03/31/2021, RECEIVED.[3089760] 21-1084 [Entered: 04/29/2021 12:53 PM] | |
3 | 3 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Fleet General Insurance Group, Inc., district court receipt # ANYEDC-14420704., FILED.[3089762] 21-1084 [Entered: 04/29/2021 12:54 PM] | |
4 | 4 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3089763] 21-1084 [Entered: 04/29/2021 12:54 PM] | |
Att: 1 1 pgs Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed | ||
Att: 2 6 pgs Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED |