Goney v. SuttonPark Capital LLC
Original Case: 1:20-cv-05387
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:21-cv-01101 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Case Filed: | Apr 29, 2021 |
Terminated: | Nov 02, 2021 |
Last checked: Wednesday Nov 03, 2021 4:32 AM EDT |
Defendant
Edward Stone
|
|
Defendant - Appellant
SuttonPark Capital LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
SuttonPark Structured Settlements LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Rodney Goney
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Lori Goney
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
T.N., through his Power of Attorney
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11/03/2021 4:29 AM EDT |
Thursday, April 29, 2021 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant SuttonPark Capital LLC and SuttonPark Structured Settlements LLC, FILED. [3090389] 21-1101 [Entered: 04/30/2021 10:16 AM] | |
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax | ||
Att: 2 10 pgs Case FILED | ||
2 | 2 1 pgs DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 03/31/2021, RECEIVED.[3090401] 21-1101 [Entered: 04/30/2021 10:19 AM] | |
3 | 3 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant SuttonPark Capital LLC and SuttonPark Structured Settlements LLC, district court receipt # ANYSDC-24472504, FILED.[3090409] 21-1101 [Entered: 04/30/2021 10:20 AM] | |
5 | 5 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3090414] 21-1101 [Entered: 04/30/2021 10:22 AM] | |
Att: 1 1 pgs Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed | ||
Att: 2 11 pgs Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED |