Of A Feather, LLC v. Allegro Credit Services, LLC
Original Case: 1:19-cv-09351
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:21-cv-01107 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Case Filed: | Apr 30, 2021 |
Terminated: | Feb 01, 2022 |
Last checked: Wednesday Feb 02, 2022 3:30 AM EST |
Def-Third-Party-Plaintiff-Counter-Claimant -
Allegro Credit Services, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
Jared B. Stammell
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
Susan Stammell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Of A Feather, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 02/02/2022 3:27 AM EST |
Friday, April 30, 2021 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Of A Feather, LLC, FILED. [3090945] 21-1107 [Entered: 04/30/2021 04:14 PM] | |
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax | ||
Att: 2 13 pgs Case FILED | ||
2 | 2 26 pgs DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 03/18/2021, RECEIVED.[3090947] 21-1107 [Entered: 04/30/2021 04:16 PM] | |
3 | 3 1 pgs DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 03/18/2021, RECEIVED.[3090949] 21-1107 [Entered: 04/30/2021 04:17 PM] | |
4 | 4 NOTE: See lead case, 21-960, containing complete set of docket entries.[3090951] 21-1107 21-960] [Entered: 04/30/2021 04:17 PM] | |
5 | 5 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3090952] 21-1107 [Entered: 04/30/2021 04:17 PM] | |
Att: 1 1 pgs Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed | ||
Att: 2 12 pgs Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED |